Hack et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Skylar Hack, Heather Hack and Gregory Hack
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00134
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Lynn Moffa to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3081489. by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Klapheke, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (ALS).
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Harnaik (Nick) Kahlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3081488. by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Klapheke, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (ALS).
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Joseph A. Cancila Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3081484. by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Klapheke, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (ALS).
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certified Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Cope Case, #4 Exhibit C - 2011 MCE Report, #5 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 3/10/2020; re #7 . Answer due by 4/7/2020. cc: Counsel (ALS)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company by State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by C. David Ewing on behalf of Gregory Hack, Heather Hack, Skylar Hack (Ewing, C.)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon B. Willis on behalf of Gregory Hack, Heather Hack, Skylar Hack (Willis, Damon)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Hack, Skylar Hack, Gregory Hack. State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service - State Farm) (Aguiar, Sam)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SMJ)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (SMJ)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company; Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3047141; filed by Heather Hack, Skylar Hack, and Gregory Hack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Market Conduct Exams, #2 Exhibit B - Utilization Reviews and EOBs, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hack et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn Moffa
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Harnaik Nick Kahlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar Hack
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Represented By: Miles D. Mussetter
Represented By: Jonathan B. Hollan
Represented By: C. David Ewing
Represented By: Damon B. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hack
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Represented By: Miles D. Mussetter
Represented By: Jonathan B. Hollan
Represented By: C. David Ewing
Represented By: Damon B. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hack
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Represented By: Miles D. Mussetter
Represented By: Jonathan B. Hollan
Represented By: C. David Ewing
Represented By: Damon B. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?