Levesque v. Charter Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Levesque
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00140
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 4/15/2020; Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 3/15/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 2/16/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 4/30/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel (ALS)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Anna Beilman by Jessica Levesque (Smith, Robyn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Charter Communications, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Imhof, Kevin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Charter Communications, LLC. (Imhof, Kevin)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT(EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/3/2020. Rule 16 case Management Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel (ALS)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/2/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Charter Communications, LLC. (Halliday, Culver)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (ALS)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Charter Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, LLC. by Charter Communications, LLC. (ALS)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charter Communications, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-007053 (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3047685) filed by Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings.pdf) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levesque v. Charter Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Levesque
Represented By: Anna C. Beilman
Represented By: Robert W. Bishop
Represented By: John S. Friend
Represented By: Robyn R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Imhof
Represented By: Culver V. Halliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?