Wells v. Stanton Health Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Wells
Defendant: Stanton Health Center, LLC, Stanton Health Facilities, LP and PCPMG Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00142
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 020
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant PCPMG Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Graniting Motion to Dismiss) (Bumgarner, Kyle)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/8/2020. The Agreed Order #21 is GRANTED. Defendant Stanton Health Center, LLC, SHALL have up to and including 4/22/2020, within which to file an Answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (ALS)
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension for Responsive Pleadings II by Stanton Health Center, LLC. (Pullen, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle G. Bumgarner on behalf of PCPMG Consulting, LLC (Bumgarner, Kyle)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bachert on behalf of PCPMG Consulting, LLC (Bachert, Scott)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/2/2020; Granting #17 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants PCPMG Consulting, LLC, and Stanton Health Facilities, LP, SHALL have up to and including 4/17/2020, within which to file their responsive pleadings to plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (ALS)
April 1, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by PCPMG Consulting, LLC, Stanton Health Facilities, LP. (U'Sellis, Megan)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/27/2020, granting #13 - Warren D. Astbury is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the plaintiff in this action. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Order re #13 MOTION for Warren Astbury to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3070866. by Phyllis Wells. (Asay, Joseph) Modified on 3/26/2020 to add PDF as DN #13 -2 (ALS).
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT(s) re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Phyllis Wells. (Asay, Joseph) Modified on 3/25/2020 to attach PDF as DN #13 -1 (ALS).
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Warren Astbury to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3070866. by Plaintiff Phyllis Wells (Asay, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (ALS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (ALS).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/20/2020, GRANTING #9 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants PCPMG Consulting, LLC, and Stanton Health Facilities, LP, have up to and including 4/3/2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/20/2020, GRANTING #7 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Stanton Health Center, LLC, has until 4/8/2020 within which to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PCPMG Consulting, LLC, Stanton Health Facilities, LP. (U'Sellis, Megan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by PCPMG Consulting, LLC, Stanton Health Facilities, LP by PCPMG Consulting, LLC, Stanton Health Facilities, LP. (U'Sellis, Megan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan R. U'Sellis on behalf of PCPMG Consulting, LLC, Stanton Health Facilities, LP (U'Sellis, Megan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order by Stanton Health Center, LLC by Stanton Health Center, LLC. (Pullen, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phyllis Wells. PCPMG Consulting, LLC served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Asay, Joseph)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phyllis Wells as to:Stanton Health Facilities, LP, SERVICE by Publication filed by Phyllis Wells., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phyllis Wells. Stanton Health Facilities, LP served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (Asay, Joseph)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phyllis Wells. Phyllis Wells served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Asay, Joseph)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PCPMG Consulting, LLC, Stanton Health Center, LLC, and Stanton Health Facilities, LP. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (MNM)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PCPMG Consulting, LLC, Stanton Health Center, LLC, and Stanton Health Facilities, LP. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3048549, filed by Phyllis Wells. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Stanton Health Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Health Center, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Pullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Health Facilities, LP
Represented By: Megan R. U'Sellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCPMG Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Kyle G. Bumgarner
Represented By: Megan R. U'Sellis
Represented By: Scott A. Bachert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Wells
Represented By: Joseph Corey Asay
Represented By: Warren D. Astbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?