PSC Industries, Inc. v. Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: PSC Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00146
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 4/16/2020. The scheduling conference set for 4/17/2020 is REMANDED from the Court's docket. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 5/1/2020; Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 9/4/2020; Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 10/2/2020; Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2020; Discovery due by 10/30/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2020. A Telephonic Status Conference is scheduled for 5/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call. cc: Counsel (AEH)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by PSC Industries, Inc.. (Leigh, Michael)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent PMC Global, Inc. for PSC Industries, Inc., PSC Industries, Inc.. by PSC Industries, Inc.. (Leigh, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PSC Industries, Inc.. (Leigh, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 2/28/2020 - Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. (KD)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 2/27/2020 granting #5 Motion for David M. Tang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 2/26/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for David M. Tang to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3051599. by Defendant Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc., Counter Claimant Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Crosby, Katherine)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
February 25, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against PSC Industries, Inc. by Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc.. (DJT)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc.. (DJT)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-007349. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3050253, filed by Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Pltf's Answers to First Set of Reqs for Admissions (2-16-20), #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal (State Court)) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PSC Industries, Inc. v. Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSC Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Leigh
Represented By: David S. Kaplan
Represented By: Andrea N. Aikin
Represented By: Casey L. Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarbrough Technical Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin E. McCall
Represented By: David M. Tang
Represented By: Katherine L. Crosby
Represented By: David B. Tachau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?