Miller et al v. Sleem
Plaintiff: Eugene Miller, Cynthia Miller and Evetta Coleman
Defendant: Paul R Sleem
Petitioner: Scott A Wallitsch
Case Number: 3:2020cv00153
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 40 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Paul R Sleem. (Jackson, Chad)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 4/24/2020 granting #36 Motion for Scott A. Wallitsch to Withdraw his appearance. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
April 23, 2020 Filing 38 ERROR: proposed order filed separately by counsel. attached to appropriate motion (DN #36 ) by clerk. Modified on 4/23/2020 (SMJ).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 4/23/2020 granting #35 Motion for attorney Mintrel D. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
April 23, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Movant Scott A Wallitsch. (Wallitsch, Scott) Modified on 4/23/2020 - to correct relief and attach proposed order filed by counsel at DN 38 (SMJ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (SMJ).
April 15, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Mintrel D. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 125, receipt number L33063576, by Plaintiffs Evetta Coleman, Evetta Coleman, Cynthia Miller, Eugene Miller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (SMJ)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 3/25/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 11:00 AM Eastern Time (10:00 AM Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (*see order for deadlines.) cc: counsel (DLW)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/25/2020 granting #31 Movant's Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiffs and their counsel, Mr. Mintrel Martin, are granted an extension of twenty-one (21) days in order to retain local counsel and/or to permit Mr. Martin time to file his Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/24/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny L. King for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge King. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-LLK. (ARM)
March 13, 2020 MOTION for Extension of Time to Retain Counsel and/or permit Mr. Martin time to file a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Viceby Plaintiffs Evetta Coleman, Evetta Coleman, Cynthia Miller, Eugene Miller, Movant Scott A Wallitsch(SEE DN #31 FOR FULL VIEWING) (KJA)
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Wallitsch on behalf of Scott A Wallitsch (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wallitsch, Scott)
March 13, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Paul R Sleem (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Jackson, Chad)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/11/2020 granting #28 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Defendant is granted the substitution of counsel from P. Andrew Laird, Jr. and the law firm of Webster Henry, P.C., to Chad M. Jackson and the law firm of Morgan & Akins, PLLC. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
March 11, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Paul R Sleem (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jackson, Chad)
February 28, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Mintrel D. Martin re #24 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/13/2020. (JM)
February 28, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney P. Andrew Laird, Jr. re #24 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/13/2020. (JM)
February 28, 2020 Filing 25 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (JM)
February 28, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01203. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for the reasons discussed in the contemporaneously entered Memo Opn, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #14 is DENIED without prejudice; this case is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/28/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/28/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paul R Sleem. (Laird, P) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 Opposition to re #14 filed by Cynthia Miller. (Martin, Mintrel) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Show Cause Order #18 . For good cause shown, the Motion #18 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs SHALL file a response to the Order to Show Cause #16 on or before February 18, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/3/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Order to Show Cause by Cynthia Miller. (Martin, Mintrel) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Plaintiffs informal request to extend the deadline in the Order to Show Cause #16 . For good cause shown, the deadline is EXTENDED. Plaintiff SHALL file a response to the Order to Show Cause #16 on or before February 4, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/21/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff SHALL SHOW CAUSE in writing why this action should not be dismissed against Defendant; Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2020.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/10/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE the plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed against defendant: Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2020.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/10/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Paul R Sleem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Paul Sleem)(Laird, P) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Miller, Eugene Miller, Evetta Coleman(as guardian of Brandon Coleman, a minor), Evetta Coleman. Paul R Sleem served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 Alias Summons Issued as to Paul R Sleem mailed certified mail (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Cynthia Miller, Eugene Miller, Evetta Coleman(as guardian of Brandon Coleman, a minor), Evetta Coleman as to Paul R Sleem. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed; Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2020.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/12/2019. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1203-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- The General Order calls for reassignment to a district judge following the occurrence of the first of three "triggering events" absent unanimous consent; None of these events have occurred in this case, and it appears that no such events will occur in the timely manner contemplated in the General Order; Accordingly, the case is now due to be assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/11/19. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
November 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by Cynthia Miller. (Martin, Mintrel) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Paul R Sleem, sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The pltfs are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, within ten (10) calendar days, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/6/19. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Cynthia Miller. (Martin, Mintrel) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3417911 (B4601100075). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Paul R Sleem, filed by Cynthia Miller, Eugene Miller, Evetta Coleman(as guardian of Brandon Coleman, a minor), Evetta Coleman.(KEK). (Martin, Mintrel) Modified on 8/22/2019 (MRR, ). [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The pltfs initiated this matter by filing a complaint on July 29, 2019 (Doc #1 ); The complaint was not accompanied by either the required filing fee or a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis; To date, the Clerk has not received the filing fee; The pltfs are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, within ten (10) calendar days, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/14/19. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul R Sleem, filed by Cynthia Miller, Eugene Miller, Evetta Coleman(as guardian of Brandon Coleman, a minor), Evetta Coleman.(KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Sleem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Miller
Represented By: Mintrel D Martin
Represented By: Scott A. Wallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Miller
Represented By: Mintrel D Martin
Represented By: Scott A. Wallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evetta Coleman
Represented By: Mintrel D Martin
Represented By: Scott A. Wallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R Sleem
Represented By: P Andrew Laird, Jr
Represented By: Chad M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott A Wallitsch
Represented By: Scott A. Wallitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?