Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Good Karma Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Good Karma Holdings LLC, D. H., Yenanne Hernandez, Shneki Burbridge-Galbreath, Alltrade Service Solutions, LLC, Mario Alfonso, Blandford Christopher Stephen and D.H.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00156
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR FILING ANSWER TO SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY'S COMPLAINT Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 4/23/2020; granting #5 Proposed Agreed Order. The Defendants, Yenanne Hernandez, Schneki Burbridge-Galbreath, Mario Alfonso, and D.H., aminor by his next friend and parent, Yenanne Hernandez, shall have until and including 5/17/2020 to file an Answer or other response to the Plaintiffs Complaint. cc: Counsel (ALS)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Yenanne Hernandez, Shneki Burbridge- Galbreath, Mario Alfonso and D.H. by Blandford Christopher Stephen. (Blandford, Stephen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order Regarding Deadline for Filing Answer to Scottsdale Insurance Company's Complaint by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Miller, Barry)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to All (6) Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SMJ)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company, by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (SMJ)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (SMJ)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants; Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3054580, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - policy, #2 Exhibit B - amended complaint (state), #3 Exhibit C - discovery answers, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - 6 tendered) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Good Karma Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Karma Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yenanne Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shneki Burbridge-Galbreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltrade Service Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blandford Christopher Stephen
Represented By: Stephen C. Blandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?