Mitchell v. Allergan USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Mitchell
Defendant: Baptist Health Medical Group, Inc., Baptist Health Medical Group, Louisville Physicians for Women, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Arthur J. Donovan, Jr., Allergan USA, Inc. and Warner Chilcott Sales (US) LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00183
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Allergan USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Sales (US) LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliates Baptist Health Medical Group, Inc. and Baptist Healthcare System, Inc. for Baptist Health Medical Group, Louisville Physicians for Women, by Baptist Health Medical Group, Louisville Physicians for Women. (Davis, Joshua) Modified on 4/14/2020 to clarify docket text (SMJ).
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Member Baptist Healthcare System, Inc. for Baptist Health Medical Group, Inc., by Baptist Health Medical Group, Inc. (Davis, Joshua) Modified on 4/14/2020 to clarify docket text (SMJ).
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Baptist Health Medical Group, Inc., Baptist Health Medical Group, Louisville Physicians for Women, Arthur J. Donovan, Jr. (Davis, Joshua)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Baptist Health Medical Group, Inc., Baptist Health Medical Group, Louisville Physicians for Women, Arthur J. Donovan, Jr. (Davis, Joshua)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #8 MOTION to Remand ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (Gray, David)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Helen Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Gray, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/8/2020) (SMJ).
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allergan USA, Inc.. (McIntosh, Thomas)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC for Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC. by Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC. (McIntosh, Thomas)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC for Allergan USA, Inc.. by Allergan USA, Inc.. (McIntosh, Thomas)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allergan USA, Inc. and Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-001229; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3062645), filed by Allergan USA, Inc. and Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Allergan USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald R. Toner
Represented By: Joshua W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health Medical Group, Louisville Physicians for Women
Represented By: Gerald R. Toner
Represented By: Joshua W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Donovan, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald R. Toner
Represented By: Joshua W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Sales (US) LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Mitchell
Represented By: David B. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?