Anderson, et al. v. Lowe's Companies, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Anderson, Anna Maria Cruz and Ronald Anderson
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00189
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle D. Johnson on behalf of Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Johnson, Kyle)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory J. Skolnick on behalf of Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Skolnick, Cory)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE of Summons as to Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Note: Waiver of Service previously filed at DN #11 .) (CDF)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1(f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 4/2/2020. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Regina S. Edwards to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-RSE (MEJ)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronald Anderson, Anna Maria Cruz. Lowe's Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Stoops, Kevin)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronald Anderson, Anna Maria Cruz. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Stoops, Kevin)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/25/2020; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to the docket of Judge Justin R. Walker, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials JRW on all future pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, CM-Judge Walker (NWT)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 3/23/2020. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings and disposition. Counsel are instructed to change the civil action number to reflect the initials (DJH) in place and instead of the initials (GNS) on all further pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; Natalie Thompson (TJD)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ELAINA S. BAILEY Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/20/2020 granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (CDF)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KEVIN J. STOOPS Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/20/2020 granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel (CDF)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Elaina S. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3067806. by Plaintiffs Ronald Anderson, Anna Maria Cruz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A---Bailey Certificate of Good Standing State of Michigan, #2 Exhibit B--Affidavit of Elaina Bailey in support of motion for Pro Hac admission, #3 Exhibit C--Bailey ECF Registration Form W.D. Ky (original will follow by mail), #4 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac admission to Bailey) (Miller, Charles)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Kevin J. Stoops to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3067083. by Plaintiffs Ronald Anderson, Anna Maria Cruz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing Michigan 2004, #2 Exhibit A--Certificate of Good Standing Michigan 2018, #3 Exhibit B--Affidavit of Kevin Stoops in support of motion, #4 Exhibit C-Completed ECF Registration Form for Stoops (original to be mailed), #5 Proposed Order granting motion for Pro Hac admission of Kevin Stoops) (Miller, Charles)
March 16, 2020 Remark-Attested copy emailed to attorney Charles Miller 3/16/2020 (JWM)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, filed by Ronald Anderson, Anna Maria Cruz. Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3064147. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, et al. v. Lowe's Companies, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Johnson
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Johnson
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Maria Cruz
Represented By: Rod M. Johnston
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Represented By: Elaina Sue Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Anderson
Represented By: Rod M. Johnston
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Represented By: Elaina Sue Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?