Fitzpatrick v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Michael Fitzpatrick
Defendant: C. R. Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv00220
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Thomas B Russell
2 Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/19/2020 granting #17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Clerk is directed to terminate attorneys Ahmed Diab and Kristen Barton as counsel of record. cc: Counsel; Ahmed Diab; Kristen Barton(JWM)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Michael Fitzpatrick (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCarty, Sean)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/13/2020. The Motions of John H. Gomez (DN #14 ) and Naomi C. Pontious (DN #15 ) to appear pro hac vice are GRANTED. cc: Counsel; John H. Gomez; Naomi C. Pontious; Ahmed Samir Diab; Kristen K. Barton(JWM)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Naomi C. Pontious to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3097719. by Plaintiff Michael Fitzpatrick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (McCarty, Sean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (JWM).
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for John H. Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3097714. by Plaintiff Michael Fitzpatrick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (McCarty, Sean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (JWM).
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A. McCarty on behalf of Michael Fitzpatrick (McCarty, Sean)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Kristen K. Barton re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/13/2020. (KJA)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John H. Gomez re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/13/2020. (KJA)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to attorney Ahmed Samir Diab re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/13/2020. (KJA)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 4/24/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; TLB (TJD)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to Amended GO 20-06. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case.cc:counsel, CM-Stivers (KJA)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Incorporated (Foster Bird, Melissa)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-01189. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA)
March 31, 2020 Cases assigned to Judge Russell pursuant to General Order 2020-06. (KJA)
March 25, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to Western District of Kentucky via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
April 25, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1189-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]
April 25, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX171109 filed by Michael Fitzpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzpatrick v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan B. Davis
Represented By: Melissa G. Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan B. Davis
Represented By: Melissa G. Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fitzpatrick
Represented By: John H Gomez
Represented By: Kristen K Barton
Represented By: Ahmed Samir Diab
Represented By: Kristen K. Barton
Represented By: Naomi C. Pontious
Represented By: Sean A. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?