Needham v. Scheser et al
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Needham
Defendant: Michael J. Scheser and Linda Needham
Case Number: 3:2020cv00283
Filed: April 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Michael J. Scheser (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Provisional Order and Request for Appointment of Receiver, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Application for Provisional Order and Request for Appointment of Receiver, #3 Exhibit C - Agreed Provisional Order, #4 Proposed Order) (Hershberg, Paul)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Linda Needham (Tachau, David) Modified text on 6/11/2020 (JM).
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Linda Needham (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Compiled Annual Reports, #3 Exhibit Correspondence with Plaintiff's Counsel (Records Inspection), #4 Exhibit March 3, 2020 Order of Clark Circuit Court, Ind., #5 Exhibit June 5, 2020 Order of Clark Circuit Court, Ind.) (Tachau, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #6 Proposed Order) (JM).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 5/28/2020 granting #6 Proposed Agreed Order. Ms. Needham will serve an answer or Rule 12 motion on or before 6/10/2020. Mr. Scheser will serve an answer or Rule 12 motion on or before 6/11/2020. cc: Counsel (DLW)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order by Linda Needham. (Tachau, David)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1 (f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Lanny King to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-King (MEJ)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Linda Needham and Michael J. Scheser. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (MNM)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (MNM)
April 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linda Needham and Michael J. Scheser. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3085918, filed by Ronald E. Needham. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Needham v. Scheser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Scheser
Represented By: Paul Joseph Hershberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Needham
Represented By: David B. Tachau
Represented By: Katherine L. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Needham
Represented By: C. Thomas Hectus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?