Ames v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Stephen Ames
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00335
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Jackson, Gregory)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/16/2020; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel (ALS) Modified on 7/8/2020: corrected text to reflect Scheduling Conference before Judge Edwards, not Judge Boom (RLK).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/15/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Jackson, Gregory)
May 12, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court actionby Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. [1-4] (SRH)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (SRH)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Hardin Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00279. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3100554).(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Answer to request for admissions, #3 Exhibit C- Answer to interrogatories and RFP, #4 Exhibit D- Circuit court pleadings, #5 Cover Sheet)(SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ames v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Ames
Represented By: Larry D. Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Laura L. Mays
Represented By: Gregory A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?