Haynes v. General Motors Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer Haynes
Defendant: General Motors Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00389
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Waiver of Service Executed; Error: Incorrect request to waive service "sent" date. Waiver states request was sent on 6/26/2020; Correction: The sent date for the request for waiver of service changed to 6/26/2020 and answer due date changed to 8/25/2020. (CDF)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Haynes. General Motors Company waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Mullins, Earl) Modified wavier sent date and answer due date on 7/2/2020 (CDF).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 6/23/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the case number to reflect the initials GNS for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-GNS (MEJ)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint filed by General Motors Company. (Stewart, Kara)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara M. Stewart on behalf of General Motors Company (Stewart, Kara)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jennifer Haynes (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Mullins, Earl)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1 (f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to General Motors Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DLW)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against General Motors Company, Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3114905, filed by Jennifer Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Haynes
Represented By: Liam H. Michener
Represented By: Earl C. Mullins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?