The Guarantee Company of North America, USA v. David Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Guarantee Company of North America, USA
Defendant: David B. Holobaugh, III, David Construction, Inc., Kimberly A. Holobaugh and Davlin Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00419
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Construction, Inc. (Hershberg, Paul)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction by The Guarantee Company of North America, USA re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stone, Jarrod)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff The Guarantee Company of North America, USA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Christina Zabek in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Stone, Jarrod) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2020: #3 Proposed Order) (DLW).
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by David Construction, Inc., Davlin Properties, LLC, David B. Holobaugh, III, Kimberly A. Holobaugh. (Hershberg, Paul)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Guarantee Company of North America, USA. Kimberly A. Holobaugh served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Stone, Jarrod)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Guarantee Company of North America, USA. Davlin Properties, LLC served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Stone, Jarrod)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Guarantee Company of North America, USA. David B. Holobaugh, III served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Stone, Jarrod)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Guarantee Company of North America, USA. David Construction, Inc. served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Stone, Jarrod)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1 (f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SMJ)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (SMJ)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Guarantee Company of North America (USA) Holdings, Ltd. for The Guarantee Company of North America, USA, by The Guarantee Company of North America, USA. (SMJ)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Construction, Inc., Davlin Properties, LLC, David B. Holobaugh, III, and Kimberly A. Holobaugh; Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3118057; filed by The Guarantee Company of North America, USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit - Material-Labor Payment Bond, #3 Exhibit - Opinion and Order on Motions, #4 Exhibit - Letter to Hershberg re Demand, #5 Exhibit - Letter from Zabek to David Construction, et al., #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - 4 tendered) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Guarantee Company of North America, USA v. David Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Holobaugh, III
Represented By: Paul Joseph Hershberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Hershberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A. Holobaugh
Represented By: Paul Joseph Hershberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davlin Properties, LLC
Represented By: Paul Joseph Hershberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Guarantee Company of North America, USA
Represented By: Jarrod W. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?