King v. Hoskin & Muir, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara King
Defendant: Hoskin & Muir, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00425
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/10/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting Form)cc: Counsel (RLK)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Devan A. Dannelly on behalf of Barbara King (Dannelly, Devan)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hoskin & Muir, Inc.. (Barszcz, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara King. Hoskin & Muir, Inc. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hoskin & Muir, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (JWM)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hoskin & Muir, Inc., filed by Barbara King. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 0644-3119717. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Hoskin & Muir, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoskin & Muir, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara King
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?