Douglas v. Jordan et al
Plaintiff: Reese Douglas
Defendant: Scott Jordan, Srgt Oliver Carnes, Helen Long and L.L.C.C. Prison
Case Number: 3:2020cv00427
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/5/2020. Plaintiff Reese Douglas filed an application to proceed without prepayment of fees with a declaration that makes the showing required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). IT IS ORDERED that the application (DN #3 ) is GRANTED. However, the plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee under an installment plan (as set forth). cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Finance; LLCC, Attn: Inmate Accts. #288930, 1612 Dawkins Rd., LaGrange, KY 40031 (CDF)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis required. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/16/2020. cc: Reese Douglas, pro se (JWM)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Prisoner Trust Account Statement by Reese Douglas, pro se. (JWM)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Jordan, Helen Long, Oliver Carnes, and L.L.C.C. Prison, filed by Reese Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srgt Oliver Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.L.C.C. Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reese Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?