Welch v. The Hartford et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Welch
Defendant: The Hartford and Benefit Management Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv00454
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Benefit Management Services, The Hartford. (Thrash, Braxton)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 7/22/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Counsel shall review the entirety of this Order. cc: Counsel of Record (MNM)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/22/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel. CM-RSE. (ARM)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Benefit Management Services, The Hartford. (Wahlheim, William)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/6/2020 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' responsive pleading is due 7/21/2020. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/6/2020 granting #6 Motion for Attorney Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/6/2020 granting #5 Motion for Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Benefit Management Services, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3129012. by Defendants Benefit Management Services, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3129000. by Defendants Benefit Management Services, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parents Hartford Holdings, Inc., Hartford Life, Inc., and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., and Other Affiliate Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company for Benefit Management Services and The Hartford, by Benefit Management Services, The Hartford. (SMJ)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Benefit Management Services and The Hartford from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-003103, (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3126921); filed by Benefit Management Services, The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - state court docs) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. The Hartford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Management Services
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Welch
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?