Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. v. RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.
Defendant: Innovative Computer Specialists Corp., Ronnie E. Needham, RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc., Unknown Defendants and Alexander Velasco, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00496
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 9/10/2020 granting #27 Proposed Agreed Order: The time for Ronaldo to respond to Defendants'Counterclaims #23 is EXTENDED up to and including Tuesday, 9/15/2020. cc: Counsel(JM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Needham's Resignation Letter and Consent of Directors, #2 Exhibit 2: March 1, 2009 Purchase and Sale Agreement and Bill of Sale, #3 Exhibit 3: Gold Craft Assignment, #4 Exhibit 4: Needham Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5: Cox Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6: Screenshots of Revised Infringing Website) (Woodard, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 27 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Counterclaims by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.. (Woodard, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 26 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Alexander Velasco, Jr. COMPLETED on 9/1/2020. Secretary of State return states 7/28/2020. (KD)
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Hectus, C.)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/21/2020, granting #20 - Defendants' tendered Amended Answer is hereby ordered filed as of the date of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
August 23, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT , COUNTERCLAIM against Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. by Alexander Velasco, Jr. (Hectus, C.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Innovative Computer Specialists Corp. COMPLETED on 8/21/2020. Secretary of State return states 7/29/2020. (KD)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Woodard, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Innovative Computer Specialists Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hectus, C.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. by RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc.. (Hectus, C.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 REPORT OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/12/2020. Based on a discussion, the Court will conduct ex parte discussions regarding settlement. The discussions will be scheduled by the Magistrate Judge's case manager, Ashley Henry. cc: Counsel (KD)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/12/2020, granting #13 - Defendants' Motion is GRANTED, and the Defendants shall file their Answer on or before August 17, 2020. (KD)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/10/2020. On the Court's motion, a Telephonic Conference is scheduled for 8/12/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. To participate in the conference, counsel shall use the following dial in information: 1-888-808-6929, Access Code 2887606. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (AEH)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/10/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Hearing (Expedited Status Conference to Set Hearing) by Plaintiff Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Woodard, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order) (Hectus, C.)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Scheser email to Needham and Velasco, #2 Exhibit B: Scheser Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Woodard, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.. Ronnie E. Needham served on 7/18/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Woodard, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to Innovative Computer Specialists Corp. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (KD)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to Alexander Velasco, Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (KD)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR REVISED/ALIAS SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE COMPUTER SPECIALISTS CORP. by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Summons Revised Summons as to Innovative Computer Specialists Corp.) (Williamson, Sean)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR REVISED/ALIAS SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT ALEXANDER VELASCO, JR. by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Summons Revised Summons as to Alexander Velasco, Jr.) (Williamson, Sean)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.. RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Woodard, John)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Innovative Computer Specialists Corp., Ronnie E. Needham, RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc., and Alexander Velasco, Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. (MNM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Innovative Computer Specialists Corp., Ronnie E. Needham, RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc., Unknown Defendants, and Alexander Velasco, Jr. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3140338, filed by Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Trademark Registration Certificate - Ronaldo, #2 Exhibit 2: Trademark Registration Certificate - The Ronaldo CollectionCollection, #3 Exhibit 3: Notice of Acknowledgment - The Ronaldo Collection, #4 Exhibit 4: Trademark Registration Certificate - Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, #5 Exhibit 5: Jewelry Design Displayed on Ronaldo's Retail Website, #6 Exhibit 6: Copyright Registration Certificate - The Angelina Bracelet, #7 Exhibit 7: Copyright Registration Certificate - The Bella Bracelet, #8 Exhibit 8: Copyright Registration Certificate - Double Inner Beauty Bracelet, #9 Exhibit 9: Copyright Registration Certificate - I Love You Bracelet, #10 Exhibit 10: Copyright Registration Certificate - I Love You Forever Bracelet, #11 Exhibit 11: Copyright Registration Certificate - Infinite Angel Bracelet, #12 Exhibit 12: Copyright Registration Certificate - The Katbird Bracelet, #13 Exhibit 13: Copyright Registration Certificate - The Mina Bracelet, #14 Exhibit 14: Copyright Registration Certificate - Three Times the Love Bracelet, #15 Exhibit 15: Copyright Registration Certificate - The Touch Bracelet, #16 Exhibit 16: Copyright Registration Certificate - Tranquility Bracelet, #17 Exhibit 17: Copyright Office Summary - Rose's Fancy Bracelet, #18 Exhibit 18: Copyright Office Summary - New Beginings Bracelet, #19 Exhibit 19: Copyright Office Summary - Forget Me Not, #20 Exhibit 20: Copyright Office Summary - Remembrance Bracelet, #21 Exhibit 21: Licensing Agreement, #22 Exhibit 22: Web Services Agreement, #23 Exhibit 23: Infringing Website's Homepage, #24 Exhibit 24: Infringing Website's About the Artist Page, #25 Exhibit 25: Infringing Website's All About Ronaldo Jewelry & More Page, #26 Exhibit 26: Infringing Website's Mission Statement, #27 Exhibit 27: Jewelry Designs Displayed on Infringing Website, #28 Exhibit 28: Termination Letter, #29 Cover Sheet, #30 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc. v. RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Computer Specialists Corp.
Represented By: C. Thomas Hectus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie E. Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDJ Internet & Social Media, Inc.
Represented By: C. Thomas Hectus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Velasco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronaldo Designer Jewelry, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Woodard, Jr.
Represented By: Julie L. Watts
Represented By: Sean G. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?