Harris v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Plaintiff: Derek Harris
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 3:2020cv00512
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 8/28/2020. Plaintiff must respond to this Order within 30 days stating his current address. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days naming all Defendants he wishes to sue; stating how each Defendant allegedly violated his rights; and tendering a separate summons form1 for each Defendant. The amended complaint will supersede the original complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint packet, including four summons forms, with the word Amended and the instant civil action number affixed to the caption. Plaintiff is WARNED that failure to comply with this Order within 30 days will result in dismissal of the action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. cc: Plaintiff (including 1983 complaint packet and summons forms) (ALS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of SUMMONS TENDERED by Derek Harris (ALS)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 8/17/2020; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, Finance, LMDC (ALS)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Derek Harris re: serving summons(es) (ALS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Letter regarding change of address beginning 8/16/2020 by Derek Harris. (ALS)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Derek Harris (ALS)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Derek Harris (ALS)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Completed Summons and Prisoner Trust Account. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/19/2020. (ALS)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Derek Harris (ALS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Kentucky filed by Derek Harris. (ALS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2020: #1 Summons Tendered) (ALS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?