Boyle v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tim Boyle and John Chatburn
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00541
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 to Plaintiffs' proposed Second Amended Complaint by Tim Boyle, John Chatburn re #6 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement between Teamsters Local 2727 and UPS Co., #2 Exhibit 2 - Plan 524 & 525 - 2019 H&W SPD, #3 Exhibit 3 - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratification)) (Johnson, Dennis)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Tim Boyle, John Chatburn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint (without exhibits), #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Dennis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #3 Exhibit 1 to Second Amended Complaint - Collective Bargaining Agreement between Teamsters Local 2727 and UPS Co., #4 Exhibit 2 to Second Amended Complaint - Plan 524 & 525 - 2019 H&W SPD, #5 Exhibit 3 to Second Amended Complaint - SPD - Pooled Account Retirees (Pre-Ratification) (KD).
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by Tim Boyle, John Chatburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan 524/Plan 525 Plan Document) (Johnson, Dennis)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/4/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3152620., filed by Tim Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Plan Document) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Boyle
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Chatburn
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?