Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc. v. Jefferson County Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.
Defendant: Amy P. Dennes, Dr. Martin (Marty) Pollio, Jefferson County Public Schools, James (Jimmy) Adams and Jefferson County Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2020cv00555
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by James (Jimmy) Adams, Amy P. Dennes, Jefferson County Board of Education, Jefferson County Public Schools, Martin (Marty) Pollio. (White, Jordan)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by James (Jimmy) Adams, Amy P. Dennes, Jefferson County Board of Education, Jefferson County Public Schools, Martin (Marty) Pollio. (White, Jordan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.. Jefferson County Board of Education served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Smith, J.)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 09/14/2020. The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 is RESCHEDULED to 10/26/2020 at 4:00 p.m. Eastern Time before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the call by dialing the Toll-Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering Access Code 7238577# when prompted. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (cc: counsel) (MHB)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Jefferson County Board of Education. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jefferson County Board of Education) (Smith, J.)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/10/2020; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:30 AM ET/9:30 AM CT before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the Toll Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering Access Code 7238577#. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 10/2/2020 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 10/16/2020. (Review Order in full for specifics.) cc: Counsel; MB (CDF)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/10/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; Judge King's Chambers (TJD)
September 7, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James (Jimmy) Adams, Amy P. Dennes, Jefferson County Public Schools, Martin (Marty) Pollio. (White, Jordan)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the reassignment protocol set forth in GO 20-16, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (DLW)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.. James (Jimmy) Adams served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Smith, J.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.. Amy P. Dennes served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Smith, J.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.. Martin (Marty) Pollio served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Smith, J.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.. Jefferson County Public Schools served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Smith, J.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.. (Smith, J.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to James (Jimmy) Adams, Amy P. Dennes, Jefferson County Public Schools, and Martin (Marty) Pollio. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Dr. Martin Pollio, #2 Summons Issued as to James Adams, #3 Summons Issued as to Jefferson County Public Schools) (DLW)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James (Jimmy) Adams, Amy P. Dennes, Jefferson County Public Schools, and Martin (Marty) Pollio. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3158399, filed by Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered - Amy Dennes, #3 Summons Tendered - Dr. Martin Pollio, #4 Summons Tendered - James Adams, #5 Summons Tendered - Jefferson County Public Schools) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc. v. Jefferson County Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy P. Dennes
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: C. Tyson Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Martin (Marty) Pollio
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: C. Tyson Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Public Schools
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: C. Tyson Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (Jimmy) Adams
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: C. Tyson Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Represented By: C. Tyson Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, Inc.
Represented By: J. Brooken Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Swansburg, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?