Klein v. Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Klein
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00572
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/21/2021: Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 10:00 AM via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (DLW)
September 21, 2021 Filing 31 REPORT OF STATUS CONFERENCE for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/20/2021. cc: Counsel (DLW)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/30/2021 granting #28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2021. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 2/1/2021. On or before 9/17/2021, the Parties shall confer with their respective decisionmakers and contact the Court's Case Manager, Theresa Burch, at theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov with the dates on which they are available for a remote settlement conference via Zoom. cc: Counsel (DLW)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/30/2021. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 9/20/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (TLB)
August 26, 2021 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Dispositive Motion Deadline and Supplemental Discovery Deadline by Plaintiff Kathleen Klein (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zoppoth, Bradley)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/12/2021 granting #26 Motion for Robert D. Shank to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
July 8, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Robert D. Shank to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3377705. by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Carroll, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (DLW).
June 25, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Nenni on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (Nenni, David)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/19/2021 granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All fact discovery shall be completed on or before 10/1/2021. All dispositive/Daubert motions shall be filed on or before 11/1/2021. On or before 8/17/2021, the Parties shall jointly contact the Court's Case Manager, Theresa Burch, at theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov to schedule a telephonic status conference. All other provisions of DN #21 shall remain in full force and effect. cc: Counsel (DLW)
May 13, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Dispositive Motion Deadline and Deadline for a Status Conference by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davenport, Morgan)
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement Conference by Kathleen Klein. (Zoppoth, Bradley)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 12/1/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 12/4/2020. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 2/26/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 7/1/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 8/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Supplementations under FRCP 26(e) shall be completed no later than 1/2/2022. Dispositive Motions/Daubert Motions due by 10/1/2021. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference thirty (30) days prior to the close of discovery. Any party who wishes to request either a Zoom settlement conference or an ex parte call regarding settlement shall email the Court's Case Manager, Theresa Burch, copying all counsel of record, to request the same. On or before 2/5/2021, the parties shall jointly file a report informing the Court whether they will schedule an early settlement conference. cc: Counsel (DLW)
November 24, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Carroll, Scott) Modified on 12/8/2020 corrected entry from Rule 26(f) report to Rule 26 Initial Disclosures. (TLB).
November 24, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kathleen Klein. (Zoppoth, Bradley)
November 10, 2020 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Carroll, Scott)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/27/2020 granting #15 Motion for Scott Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT) Modified on 10/27/2020 to edit docket text (KJA).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/20/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 9:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. (KD)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Scott A. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3204281. by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Carroll, Scott) Modified on 10/14/2020, to clarify docket. (KD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (KD). Modified on 10/27/2020, to correct docket entry to read Scott A. Carroll. (KD)
October 7, 2020 *** See DN #14 for PDF*** Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Fifth Third Bancorp, Other Affiliate Fifth Third Financial Corporation for Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (KD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Davenport, Morgan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Davenport, Morgan)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 9/9/2020 granting #5 Motion for Roger G. Bresnahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #6 Motion for A. Federico Longoria, III, to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/9/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Order SUPERSEDES the prior referral order at Docket No. 8 . This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the reassignment protocol set forth in GO 20-16, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
August 21, 2020 NOTICE of email confirmation as to Bradley Zoppoth re #9 Request for Fee Refund (MLG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Fee Refund re #1 Complaint by Kathleen Klein. (Zoppoth, Bradley)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 8/19/2020. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM/Law Clerk-Lindsay (MEJ)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Fee Refund by Kathleen Klein. (Zoppoth, Bradley)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Alcide Federico Longoria, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3163885. by Plaintiff Kathleen Klein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Zoppoth, Bradley)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Roger G. Bresnahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3163884. by Plaintiff Kathleen Klein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Zoppoth, Bradley)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fifth Third Bank, N.A. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (DLW)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kathleen Klein. (DLW)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fifth Third Bank, N.A. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3162302, filed by Kathleen Klein. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Morgan A. Davenport
Represented By: Scott A. Carroll
Represented By: David A. Nenni
Represented By: Robert D. Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Klein
Represented By: Roger G. Bresnahan
Represented By: Bradley S. Zoppoth
Represented By: A. Federico Longoria, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?