Metcalf v. Cigna Group Insurance
Plaintiff: Janet Metcalf
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00580
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2020. Administrative record due 10/20/2020 (objections due by 11/19/2020, response to objections due by 12/17/2020); Plaintiff Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 11/24/2020. Defendant Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 12/24/2020. Discovery due by 3/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2021 (Responses due by 6/24/2021; Replies due by 7/22/2021); Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. cc: counsel (JM)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cigna Group Insurance. (Wahlheim, William)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 9/8/2020 granting #12 Motion for Attorney Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3177983. by Defendant Cigna Group Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Errata A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Braxton S. Thrash re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/14/2020. (KJA)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 08/26/2020. Due to a scheduling conflict, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 9/28/2020 at 2:30 p.m. Eastern Time is MOVED to 09/28/2020 at 3:30 p.m. Eastern Time before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the call by dialing the Toll-Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering Access Code 7238577# when prompted. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(cc: counsel) (MHB)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/26/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 1:30 PM CDT/2:30 PM EDT before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. No later than 9/7/2020, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). No later than 9/21/2020, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. cc: Counsel of Record, LLK - CM (DLW)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/25/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; Judge King's Chambers (TJD)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/25/2020 granting #5 Motion for Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (DLW)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cigna Group Insurance. (Wahlheim, William)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3167489. by Defendant Cigna Group Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record; Jefferson County Circuit Court (SRH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, by Cigna Group Insurance, identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Group Insurance. (SRH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, by Cigna Group Insurance, from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-002702. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3164157). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- state court documents, #2 Exhibit B- Lina's DOI registration, #3 Exhibit C- SOS service lookup, #4 Exhibit D- USPS tracking information, #5 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metcalf v. Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Metcalf
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?