ISCO Industries, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: ISCO Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00583
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company. (Bentley, Frederick)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order Extending Time to File Response to Complaint) (Bentley, Frederick)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/30/2020 granting #7 Motion for Attorney Andrew M. Barrios to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Andrew M. Barrios to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3193952. by Plaintiff ISCO Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Jake) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (JM).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/16/2020 granting #4 Motion for Attorney John D. Shugrue to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Andrew M. Barrios re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/25/2020. (JM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for John D. Shugrue to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3181869. by Plaintiff ISCO Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Jake) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (JM).
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (SRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, filed by ISCO Industries, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3165806. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISCO Industries, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Frederick R. Bentley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISCO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob N. Eldemire Smith
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: John D. Shugrue
Represented By: Andrew M. Barrios
Represented By: Jake E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?