Argi Financial Group, LLC v. Hardigg
Plaintiff: Argi Financial Group, LLC
Defendant: William B. Hardigg, III
Case Number: 3:2020cv00587
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Order on Motion for TRO,, filed by Argi Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 37 EXHIBIT INVENTORY (9/16/20 Evidentiary Hearing) by April Dowell, Court Reporter. (SMJ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 36 Proposed Findings of Fact, re #28 MEMORANDUM OF HEARING AND ORDER, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Argi Financial Group, LLC. (Calabrese, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/1/2020 (SMJ).
September 30, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING OF PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE AT SEPTEMBER 16, 2020 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING by Argi Financial Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Hardigg Resignation Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Hardigg email to Chris and Elizabeth Bevacqua, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Hardigg email to Mark and Karen Morris, #4 Index Ex. 4 - Hardigg email to Amy and Matt Greulach) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2020 Filing 34 Proposed Findings of Fact, re #28 MEMORANDUM OF HEARING AND ORDER, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by William B. Hardigg, III. (Roberts, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2020 (SMJ).
September 24, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE by William B. Hardigg, III re #28 Evidentiary Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 June 2017 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 Eval 2013, #4 Exhibit 4 Eval 2015, #5 Reply 5 Eval 2016, #6 Exhibit 6 Excerpts 4-2017 Handbook, #7 Exhibit 7 Eval 2016-2, #8 Exhibit 8 Eval 2017, #9 Exhibit 9 Eval 2018, #10 Exhibit 10 Eval 2020, #11 Exhibit 11 RSUs, #12 Exhibit 12 Compensation, #13 Exhibit 13 Website) (Roberts, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Filing Official Transcript re #31 Transcript - Court Official,,. Please review the complete Notice for instructions. (Dowell, April)
September 22, 2020 Filing 31 FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 09/16/2020, before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Court Reporter April R. Dowell, Email: april_dowell@kywd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020. (Dowell, April)
September 18, 2020 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #29 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Order on Motion for TRO,, by William B. Hardigg, III. (Smith, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct #19 Order on Motion for TRO,, by Defendant William B. Hardigg, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Communications) (Smith, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (SMJ).
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF HEARING AND ORDER for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings: Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/16/2020 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . The Court Reporter shall file the official transcript of the hearing within two weeks of this hearing. The parties shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law one week from receipt of the filing of the transcript. (Court Reporter: April Dowell) cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATIONS by William B. Hardigg, III re #12 Status Conference,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Sharon Brown, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Mike Conroy, #3 Exhibit C Declaration of Eric Davenport, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of Mary Grace Friesen, #5 Exhibit E Declaration of Sally Graubarth, #6 Exhibit F Declaration of Todd Hartshorn, #7 Exhibit G Declaration of Sandy Kinney, #8 Exhibit H Declaration of Lance Maclean, #9 Exhibit I Declaration of Jodie McKinley, #10 Exhibit J Declaration of Melissa Parks, #11 Exhibit K Declaration of Charlotte R. Salay) (Roberts, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE Position Statement by Argi Financial Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Argi Expedited Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit Ex B Quinlan Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex C Talent Management Matrix and Bonus Plan, #4 Exhibit Ex D ARGI ESOP SPD, #5 Exhibit Ex E Hardigg Annual ESOP Statements, #6 Exhibit Ex F Waters Email, #7 Exhibit Ex. G 9.4.20 email from Hardigg Counsel, #8 Exhibit Ex. H 9.8.20 email from Hardigg counsel, #9 Exhibit Ex. I Hardigg March 2020 emails with Horan, #10 Exhibit Ex. J Summary Table with Emails H48-H227, #11 Exhibit Ex. K H30-H44) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE Position Statement of William B. "Ben" Hardigg for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by William B. Hardigg, III (Roberts, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by William B. Hardigg, III. (Smith, James)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 9/10/2020 granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Plaintiff ARGI Financial Group, LLC must respond to Requests for Production of Documents Nos. 1-5, 8, and 12-19 and Interrogatory Nos. 1-3, and 5-10. No pre-hearing depositions will be permitted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that both parties shall respond to the other side's expedited written discovery requests by close of business on 9/11/2020. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by William B. Hardigg, III. (Smith, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Argi Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Combined & Expedited Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Email exchange, #3 Exhibit C - Email exchange, #4 Exhibit D - Email exchange, #5 Exhibit E - PL's expedited Interrogatories & RFPD, #6 Proposed Order) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE (of Filing of Security) by Argi Financial Group, LLC re #19 Order on Motion for TRO,, (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/4/2020. After weighing the applicable factors, ARGI's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (DE #4 ) is GRANTED. In light of the time required to resolve the pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the date currently set for a hearing on this matter, the Court orders the Plaintiff enter bond or other security in the amount of $20,000 within five business days of the entry of this Order and file notice of same. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 9/4/2020. Due to the urgent nature of Defendant's Motion for Expedited Discovery ([DN 15]), the Court Orders Plaintiff ARGI Financial Group, LLC to file an expedited response to Defendant's Motion by 5:00 PM on Tuesday, September 8, 2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (AEH)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/3/2020, granting #13 - Michael A. Roberts is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the Defendant in this action. cc: All Counsel (KD)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/3/2020; Referring Motion: #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by William B. Hardigg, III. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE (ARM)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Defendant William B. Hardigg, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Depositions Notice, #2 Exhibit B Document Requests, #3 Exhibit C Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D1 Email, #5 Exhibit D2 Email, #6 Exhibit D3 Email, #7 Exhibit D4 Email, #8 Exhibit D5 Email, #9 Exhibit D6 Email, #10 Exhibit E Stipulated Protective Order, #11 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Expedited Discovery) (Smith, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Argi Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order re ARGI v. Fisher, et al.) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Michael A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3175807. by Defendant William B. Hardigg, III (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate, #2 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/1/2020. Evidentiary Hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction set for 9/16/2020 at 2:15 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Position Statements shall be filed by the parties THREE days before the hearing. The motion for temporary retraining order is taken under advisement. A motion for pro hac vice as to Michael Roberts shall be filed forthwith. (Court Reporter: April Dowell) cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William B. Hardigg, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Hardigg Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 Peebles Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 Peebles Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 Fisher Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 5 Fisher Affidavit) (Smith, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William B. Hardigg, III re #1 Notice of Removal, (Smith, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE (OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT) by Argi Financial Group, LLC re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/31/2020. The parties shall be prepared to discuss this issue at the status conference before the Court scheduled for 9/1/2020, and the Defendant shall make a suitable curative filing, see 28 U.S.C. 1653, within five (5) days from the date of entry of this order. If the Court determines that it does not have subject matter jurisdiction this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE (of Filing Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) by Argi Financial Group, LLC re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE (of Filing Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order) by Argi Financial Group, LLC re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/27/2020; re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Argi Financial Group, LLC, by agreement of counsel, this matter is scheduled for a Telephone Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 01:30 PM in Teleconference before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. The parties must join the call by dialing 1-877-873-8018, then give the Access Code 1726577# and when prompted, press # again to join the call. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (ARM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Argi Financial Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Calabrese, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2020) (DLW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #2 Proposed Order) (DLW).
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson County Circuit Court (SRH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, by William B. Hardigg, III, from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-004900. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3168076 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State court complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- state court motion for restraining order, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argi Financial Group, LLC v. Hardigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argi Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Amy L. Miles
Represented By: Jeffrey Calabrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Hardigg, III
Represented By: James Stephen Smith
Represented By: Michael A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?