Conway v. Amazon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julie Conway
Defendant: Reedgroup and Amazon, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00625
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 ATTACHMENT(s) re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - S. Ahmad Certificate of Good Standing) by Amazon, Inc..
October 25, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Julie Conway. (Florio, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/5/2020, granting #9 - Richard C. McCrea, Jr. is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the Defendant in this action. cc: All Counsel (KD)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/5/2020, granting #13 - Stephanie D. Ahmad is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the Defendant in this action. cc: All Counsel (KD)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Stephane D. Ahmad to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3197295. by Defendant Amazon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Proposed Visiting Attorney, Stephanie D. Ahmad, #2 Proposed Order) (Sanjabi, Bardia)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 Response to #10 Notice of Deficiency filed by Amazon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (Sanjabi, Bardia)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Amazon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Goines v. Liberty Life, #3 Exhibit 2 - Lowe v. Lincoln Nat'l, #4 Exhibit 3 - Bailey v. LLFLEX, #5 Exhibit 4 - Amazon STD Plan, #6 Exhibit 5 - Amazon LTD Plan, #7 Exhibit 6 - Hogan v. Jacobson, #8 Exhibit 7 - Barrett v. Aetna Life, #9 Exhibit 8 - Fisk v. Cigna Grp., #10 Exhibit 9 - Atl. Plastic v. Anthem, #11 Exhibit 10 - Miles v. Fed. Ins, #12 Exhibit 11 - Perkins v. U.S. Airways, #13 Exhibit 12 - Hackney v. Lincoln Nat'l, #14 Exhibit 13 - Koebel v. S. Graphic Sys., #15 Exhibit 14 - Basham v. Prudential Ins., #16 Proposed Order) (Sanjabi, Bardia)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason for Deficiency: insufficient Cert. of Good Standing. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/9/2020. (SMJ)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Richard C. McCrea, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3192252. by Defendant Amazon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Proposed Visiting Attorney, Richard C. McCrea, Jr., #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Florida), #3 Proposed Order) (Sanjabi, Bardia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2020: #4 Exhibit - CGS (FL Supreme Ct.)) (SMJ).
September 15, 2020 Response to #6 Notice of Deficiency for Bardia Sanjabi. Mr. Sanjabi is admitted to practice in our Court. (KJA)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Stephanie D. Ahmad re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/1/2020. (KJA)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard C. McCrea, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/1/2020. (KJA)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Bardia Sanjabi re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/28/2020. (KJA)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/11/2020 granting #4 Proposed Agreed Order. The deadline for Amazon, Inc. to answer, plead, move, object, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including 9/25/2020. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Amazon, Inc.. (Sanjabi, Bardia)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal.cc: counsel of record, Jefferson County Circuit Court (SRH)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon, Inc. from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-04658. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3178105). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- state court docket, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway v. Amazon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reedgroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie D. Ahmad
Represented By: Bardia Sanjabi
Represented By: Richard C. McCrea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Conway
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?