Tilford v. Hyster-Yale Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Tilford
Defendant: Hyster-Yale Group, Inc. and Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00742
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hyster-Yale Group, Inc., Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.. (West, Linsey)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 11/23/2020 - Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. To participate in the conference, counsel shall use the following dial-in information: 1-888-808-6929, Access Code 2887606. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/23/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service as to Kroger Limited Partnership re #5 . (KD)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Kroger Co. (re DN #5 ). (SMJ)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.. (West, Linsey)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hyster-Yale Group, Inc.. (West, Linsey)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM by Mark Tilford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kroger LP Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Kroger Co. Subpoena) (Nefzger, William)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-005909. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyster-Yale Group, Inc., Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.. (ALS)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hyster-Yale Group, Inc., Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-005909. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3220721) filed by Hyster-Yale Group, Inc., Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3, State Court Record, #4 Supplement Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilford v. Hyster-Yale Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyster-Yale Group, Inc.
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Catherine S. Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.
Represented By: Linsey Walker West
Represented By: Catherine S. Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Tilford
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Represented By: Andrew S. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?