Woehler v. WesBanco Bank, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Verta Woehler
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., WesBanco Bank, Inc. doing business as First Federal Savings Bank, Trans Union, LLC, WesBanco Bank, Inc. doing business as Community Bank of Kentucky, Inc. and The First State Bank of Irvington
Case Number: 3:2020cv00755
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WesBanco Bank, Inc. (Repasky, William)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/23/2020 granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wesbanco Defendants' answer in response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be due on or before 12/30/2020. cc: Counsel (DLW)
December 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Verta Woehler re #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hemminger, David)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/16/2020: Woehler's claims against Trans Union are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Trans Union, LLC as a defendant in the record of this matter. This Order does not affect Woehler's claims against any other defendant. cc: counsel (JM)
December 15, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Verta Woehler (Attachments: #1 proposed amended complaint, #2 Summons) (Hemminger, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2020: #3 Proposed Order) (DLW).
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WesBanco Bank, Inc. (Corporate Parent: Wesbanco, Inc.) (Repasky, William) Modified on 12/14/2020 to add Corporate Parent (DLW)
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant WesBanco Bank, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreed Order) (Repasky, William)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliates Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Thacker, Christopher)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Thacker, Christopher)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED Corporate Disclosure Statement by The First State Bank of Irvington. Amendment to #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The First State Bank of Irvington. (Fenton, Thomas) Modified on 12/2/2020, to clarify docket. (KD)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of service of discovery by The First State Bank of Irvington (Fenton, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The First State Bank of Irvington. (Fenton, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent First Breckinridge Bancshares, Inc. for The First State Bank of Irvington. by The First State Bank of Irvington. (Fenton, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Fenton on behalf of The First State Bank of Irvington (Fenton, Thomas)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/13/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., The First State Bank of Irvington, Trans Union, LLC, WesBanco Bank, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Experian, #2 Summons as to First Federal, #3 Summons as to First State, #4 Summons as to Trans Union) (DJT)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., The First State Bank of Irvington, Trans Union, LLC, WesBanco Bank, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3224230., filed by Verta Woehler. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woehler v. WesBanco Bank, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WesBanco Bank, Inc. doing business as First Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WesBanco Bank, Inc. doing business as Community Bank of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: William T. Repasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First State Bank of Irvington
Represented By: John T. McGarvey
Represented By: John Morgan McGarvey
Represented By: Thomas C. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verta Woehler
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?