Cox et al v. Impact Home Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Impact Holdings LLC, Travis Cox and Impact Homes Group
Defendant: Jesse Allen and Impact Home Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00053
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/3/2021. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all Defendants, all dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED, and this matter is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction,[R. 5], is DENIED as moot. cc: Counsel of Record (MNM)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Travis Cox, Impact Holdings LLC (Miller, Kyle)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to Jesse Allen, Impact Home Group, LLC. and Impact Home Group, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons to Impact Home Group, LLC (Louisville Address), #2 Alias summons to Jesse Allen) (JM)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Impact Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kentucky Certificate, #2 Exhibit Social Media Screenshot, #3 Exhibit Memorandum of Assignment, #4 Exhibit Indiana Broker Information, #5 Exhibit Indiana Secretary of State Screenshot, #6 Exhibit Kentucky Articles of Incorporation, #7 Proposed Order) (Miller, Kyle)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Alias Summons by Travis Cox, Impact Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Miller, Kyle)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Jesse Allen, #2 Summons for Impact Home Group, LLC) (ALS)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (ALS)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3273907) filed by Impact Holdings LLC, Travis Cox. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Kentucky Certificate, #3 Exhibit - Social Media Screen Shot, #4 Exhibit - Memorandum of Assignment, #5 Exhibit - Indiana Information, #6 Exhibit - Indiana SOS Information, #7 Exhibit - Kentucky Articles of Incorporation, #8 Summons - Jesse Allen, #9 Summons - Impact Homes Group, LLC., #10 Summons - Impact Homes Group, LLC.) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Impact Home Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impact Holdings LLC
Represented By: Kyle W. Miller
Represented By: Jared A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Cox
Represented By: Kyle W. Miller
Represented By: Jared A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impact Homes Group
Represented By: Kyle W. Miller
Represented By: Jared A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Home Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?