Wooley v. Robey et al
Plaintiff: Corey Wooley
Defendant: Captain Crawford, Officer Heitzman, Officer Cook, UA Helen Long, UA Harleen and Warden Amy Robey
Case Number: 3:2021cv00067
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/22/2021 granting ( #2 and #7 ) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Luther Luckett Correctional Complex shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $3.67. Thereafter, the Luther Luckett Correctional Complex shall collect the $346.33 balance of the filing fee by collecting monthly payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account. The Clerk of this Court is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. cc: Plaintiff-pro se, KYWD-Finance, LLCC-Inmate Accts. (255869) (SMJ)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Corey Wooley. (SMJ)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Corey Wooley. (SMJ)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency filed by Corey Wooley. (SMJ)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Not on court-approved forms. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/8/2021. (SRH)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Corey Wooley. (SRH)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Corey Wooley. (SRH)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Corey Wooley, against Warden Amy Robey, Officer Cook, Captain Crawford, UA Harleen, Officer Heitzman, and UA Helen Long, (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wooley v. Robey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Heitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UA Helen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UA Harleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Amy Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Wooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?