Zarick v. DocVerify, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen G. Zarick
Defendant: DocVerify, Inc. and Darcy Mayer
Case Number: 3:2021cv00097
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DocVerify, Inc. (Lewis, Danielle)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re: PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #8 MOTION for Lee Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3325216; Correct document attached to this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, Danielle)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Lee Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3325216 by Defendants DocVerify, Inc., Darcy Mayer (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lee Sherman, #2 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Danielle) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/15/2021) (DLW).
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Stephen G. Zarick re #6 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment (Johnson, Clark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Plaintiff Stephen G. Zarick (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Clark C. Johnson, #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Clark)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen G. Zarick. Darcy Mayer served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Johnson, Clark)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen G. Zarick. DocVerify, Inc. served on 3/2/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (Johnson, Clark)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Mayer) (ALS)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (ALS)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3285683) filed by Stephen G. Zarick. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 2017 Contract, #3 Exhibit B - 2020 Contract) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zarick v. DocVerify, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DocVerify, Inc.
Represented By: Lee A. Sherman
Represented By: Danielle J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcy Mayer
Represented By: Lee A. Sherman
Represented By: Danielle J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G. Zarick
Represented By: Michael T. Leigh
Represented By: Clark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?