Gavi Medical LLC v. Lalo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gavi Medical LLC
Defendant: Lalo, LLC, Jay Taylor and Samir Taieb
Case Number: 3:2021cv00110
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Lalo, LLC, Samir Taieb, and Jay Taylor. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - LALO, #2 Summons - Taieb) (SMJ)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Tendered Summons by Gavi Medical LLC re #5 Attachments, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons Service upon Jay Taylor, #2 Summons Service upon LALO LLC, #3 Summons Service upon Samir Taieb) (Key, Jarad)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT(s) Exhibit A re #1 Complaint by Gavi Medical LLC. (Key, Jarad)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Gavi Medical LLC re #1 Complaint (Key, Jarad)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (SRH)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Gavi Medical LLC, against Lalo, LLC, Samir Taieb, and Jay Taylor. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3286590. (SRH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2021: #1 Cover Sheet) (SMJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gavi Medical LLC v. Lalo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavi Medical LLC
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Represented By: Jarad N. Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lalo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samir Taieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?