Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc. v. Log Still Distilling, LLC
Plaintiff: Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc.
Defendant: Log Still Distilling, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00190
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 4/27/2021. The court adopts the deadlines as set forth in the parties' joint status report #23 . The Court sets a hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction #4 on September 22, 2021 at 9:30 am Eastern in the Louisville Courthouse before Judge Beaton. In light of the later hearing date, if the parties prefer to extend any of the discovery or briefing deadlines set forth in the status report, they may do so by mutual consent and without informing the Court, so long as the briefing concludes by September 8. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
April 26, 2021 Filing 23 Joint STATUS REPORT by Log Still Distilling, LLC and by Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc.. (Brooker, Christopher)
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Log Still Distilling, LLC. (Skolnick, Cory)
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Log Still Distilling, LLC. (Skolnick, Cory)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 4/19/2021. Judge Beaton held a telephonic status conference in this case on April 19, 2021. The parties to file a proposed agreed briefing schedule on or before April 26, 2021. (Court Reporter: Dena Legg. (TIC: 41min) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 4/13/2021. The Court reschedules the Telephonic Status Conference currently set for 4/15/2021 for 4/19/2021 at 3:30 P.M. Eastern. The Court anticipates addressing the scheduling disputes in the joint status report [DN 15]. Counsel may connect by dialing 888-363-4734 and entering access code 4268238. Should counsel need to reschedule this conference to avoid a conflict, please contact opposing counsel and propose at least two mutually convenient alternative windows by contacting chambers at Judge_Beaton_Chambers@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 4/13/2021. The Court would like to schedule a Telephonic Status Conference for 4/15/2021 at 1:30 P.M. Eastern. The Court anticipates addressing the scheduling disputes in the joint status report [DN #15 ]. Counsel may connect by dialing 888-363-4734 and entering access code 4268238. Should counsel need to reschedule this conference to avoid a conflict, please contact opposing counsel and propose at least two mutually convenient alternative windows by contacting chambers at Judge_Beaton_Chambers@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (JM)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 4/12/2021. The Court adopts the Parties' proposed deadlines for serving initial written discovery requests (April 14) and filing Log Stills responsive pleading (April 23), consistent with the agreement set forth in the joint status report [DN #15 ]. The Court will address the remaining deadlines in a subsequent order. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 4/7/2021 granting #13 Motion for Attorney Robert A. Angle to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Lindsay Henner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Log Still Distilling, LLC and by Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc.. (Brooker, Christopher)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Lindsay Mitchell Henner to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3318223. by Defendant Log Still Distilling, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Skolnick, Cory)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Robert A. Angle to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3318221. by Defendant Log Still Distilling, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Skolnick, Cory)
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory J. Skolnick on behalf of Log Still Distilling, LLC (Skolnick, Cory)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 3/26/2021. Judge Beaton held a telephonic status conference in this case on March 26, 2021. Christopher Brooker and Sean Williamson appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff; Cory Skolnick and Robert Angle (pro hac vice forthcoming) appeared on behalf of the Defendant. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report and proposed schedule consistent with the parties' discussion on or before April 6, 2021. The Court further GRANTS Plaintiff's unopposed motion (DN #5 ) to file a brief in excess of the page limits This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Court Reporter: Becky Boyd.)(TIC:20 min) cc: counsel (JM)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc.. Log Still Distilling, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. (Brooker, Christopher)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 3/24/2021. The Court would like to schedule a Telephonic Status Conference for 3/26/2021 at 11:30A.M. Eastern. The Court anticipates addressing the motion for preliminary injunction (DN #3 ) and setting a briefing and argument schedule. Counsel may connect by dialing 888-363-4734 and entering access code 4268238. Should counsel need to reschedule this conference to avoid a conflict, please contact opposing counsel and propose at least two mutually convenient alternative windows by contacting chambers at Judge_Beaton_Chambers@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Log Still Distilling, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (MNM)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Max Shapira, #2 Exhibit 2 - ABV Network Article from 9/6/18, #3 Exhibit 3 - Log Still Website Printouts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dant Crossing Website Printout, #5 Exhibit 5 - TTAB Order and Withdrawal of Application, #6 Exhibit 6 - Distillery Trail Headline, #7 Exhibit 7 - Facebook Posting, #8 Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction) (MNM)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc. (MNM)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Log Still Distilling, LLC, filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3310481, filed by Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration & Current USPTO Status, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Assumed Name, #3 Exhibit C - Listing of Log Still's Trademark Applications, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc. v. Log Still Distilling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heaven Hill Distilleries, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W. Brooker
Represented By: Julie L. Watts
Represented By: Matthew A. Williams
Represented By: Sean G. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Log Still Distilling, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Angle
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Represented By: Lindsay Mitchell Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?