McDonald v. Meijer Stores Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Ruth McDonald
Defendant: Unknown Defendant, Meijer Stores Limited Partnership and Envision Facility Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00221
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 5/27/21: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference reset for 7/22/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel shall connect to the call at that time by dialing the toll-free meeting number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577# when prompted. cc:counsel (DJT)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 5/25/21: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel shall connect to the call at that time by dialing the toll-free meeting number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577# when prompted. cc:counsel (DJT)
May 21, 2021 Filing 17 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Ruth McDonald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2nd amended complaint, #2 Proposed Order proposed order for second amended complaint) (Armstrong, Bryan)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/20/21: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2021 at 12:00 PM ET(11:00 AM CST) before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577#. cc: Counsel (DJT)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/17/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Lanny King for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except for pretrial conference and trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Envision Facility Solutions, LLC. (Barton, Neil)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Envision Facility Solutions, LLC. (Barton, Neil)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruth McDonald. Envision Facility Solutions, LLC served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Retrun Receipt) (Armstrong, Bryan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Gray, Lindsay)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/21/21: This Court's Order to Show Cause, [R. #9 ], is DISCHARGED. Jurisdictional discovery is GRANTED for the limited purpose of investigating the citizenship of Envision Solutions, LLC and any agent or employee of Envision Solutions, LLC whom Plaintiff intends to name as a defendant in this case. Discovery SHALL be limited to these narrow issues and SHALL be conducted within thirty (30) days of service of process of Envision Solutions, LLC. Within ten (10) days of the conclusion of this limited discovery period, Plaintiff shall file a status report or apt motion with the Court, addressing any newly acquired information and attaching relevant exhibits. Defendants shall have ten (10) days to respond to the status report or motion. cc:counsel (DJT)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Ruth McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Article of Incorp of Envision, #2 Proposed Order proposed order for discovery) (Armstrong, Bryan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Envision Facility Solutions, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Meijer Stores Limited Partnership, Unknown Defendant, Envision Facility Solutions, LLC, filed by Ruth McDonald. (DJT)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/14/21; granting #5 Motion to Amend/Correct: Plaintiff's Motion for First Amended Complaint, [R. #5 ], is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, [R. #5 -2], shall be considered filed as of the date of the entry of this Order. Within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Specifically, Plaintiff will provide sufficient detail regarding the citizenship of Defendant Envision Solutions, LLC. cc: Counsel(DJT)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Ruth McDonald (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) (Armstrong, Bryan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (DJT)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-001619. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3320833, filed by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Corporate Documents) (DJT)
April 8, 2021 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Filed in Jefferson Circuit Court - See DN #1 -2.) by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Meijer Stores Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Represented By: Lindsay M. Gray
Represented By: Christopher M. Piekarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envision Facility Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Neil E. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth McDonald
Represented By: Bryan R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?