Meagher v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Meagher
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club #8111 doing business as Sam's Club, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust doing business as Sam's Club #8111 doing business as Sam's Club and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Sam's Club #8111 doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 3:2021cv00249
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Adams, Jennifer)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 5/21/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting Form)cc: Counsel (RLK)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION AND DISMISSAL Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/26/2021 granting #5 Proposed Agreed Order. All claims made against Walmart Stores East, LP in the Plaintiff's Complaint shall be deemed to have been made against Sam's East, Inc. and all defenses contained in the Answer to Complaint on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP shall be deemed to have been made by Sam's East, Inc. All of Plaintiff's claims against Walmart Stores East, LP. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Sam's East, Inc. and Sam's Real Estate Business Trust remain. cc: Counsel (SRH)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order of Substitution and Dismissal by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Adams, Jennifer)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson County Circuit Court (SRH)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (SRH)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Walmart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Walmart Inc. for Sam's East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (SRH)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, and Sam's Real Estate Business Trust from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-001829. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3326725). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- state court record, #2 Cover Sheet) (SRH)
April 19, 2021 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Filed in Jefferson County Circuit Court - See DN #1 -1). by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Sam's East, Inc. and Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meagher v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Meagher
Represented By: David Warner Mushlin
Represented By: Jonathan T. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club #8111 doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Real Estate Business Trust doing business as Sam's Club #8111 doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Sam's Club #8111 doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?