Granges Americas, Inc. v. LLFlex, LLC
Plaintiff: Granges Americas, Inc.
Defendant: LLFlex, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00284
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/18/2021. The Court's TRO Order (DE #16 ) is VACATED. The Preliminary Injunction hearing on 5/25/2021 is TERMINATED. This case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction, and stricken from the Court's docket. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ARBITRATOR DECISION by LLFlex, LLC re #16 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - May 14, 2021 Arbitration Order) (Gleason, Thomas)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/17/2021 granting #19 Motion for Attorney Lindsey A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/15/2021; the briefing and scheduled Preliminary Injunction Hearing in this matter on 5/25/2021 are hereby SUSPENDED until further Order of this Court. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (ARM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Lindsey A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3343108. by Plaintiff Granges Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
May 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ARBITRATOR DECISION by LLFlex, LLC re 17 Order, (Gleason, Thomas)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/12/2021; the Parties are ORDERED to provide written documentation to the Court by the close of business tomorrow (5/13/2021) indicating the outcome of their scheduled initial call with the Emergency Arbitrator. [See DE 12 at 165]. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (ARM)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/12/2021. LLFlex's motion for a briefing schedule (DE #12 ) is GRANTED in part and this action is scheduled for a preliminary injunction hearing on 5/25/2021 at 12:30 p.m. EST at the Gene Snyder United States Courthouse, Louisville, Kentucky. No later than three days before the preliminary injunction hearing, the parties shall file: a) A list of witnesses to be presented at the preliminary injunction hearing; and b) A list of exhibits to be presented at the preliminary injunction hearing. Plaintiff Granges's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (DE #7 ) is GRANTED in part as specified below. The parties shall immediately notify the Court of any decision by the American Arbitration Association in this matter. The Plaintiff shall enter bond or other security in the amount of $25,000 and file notice of same. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Entry of a Briefing Schedule re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in Aid of Arbitration filed by Granges Americas, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. McSherry on behalf of Granges Americas, Inc. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/10/2021 granting #10 Motion for Attorney Matthew D. Gurbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of a Briefing Schedule re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in Aid of Arbitration by Defendant LLFlex, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gleason, Thomas) Modified on 5/11/2021, text added (SMJ).
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Gleason on behalf of LLFlex, LLC (Gleason, Thomas)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Gurbach Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3339232. by Plaintiff Granges Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to LLFlex, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued) (SMJ)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in Aid of Arbitration by Jeffrey P. McSherry on behalf of Granges Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 7, 2021 Letter) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in Aid of Arbitration by Plaintiff Granges Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attorney Certificate, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN AID OF ARBITRATION against LLFlex, LLC, filed by Granges Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Supply Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 21, 2021 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 23, 2021 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - April 29, 2021 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - UCC Filing, #6 Exhibit 6 - Illinois UCC Filing, #7 Exhibit 7 - Aging Report, #8 Exhibit 8 - LLFlex Corporate Disclosures, #9 Exhibit 9 - Answer of Pinnacle Packaging, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Exempt Offering of Securities, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Removal, #12 Summons, #13 Summons) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/6/2021 re #1 Complaint filed by Granges Americas, Inc. The Plaintiff shall make a suitable curative filing, see 28 U.S.C. 1653, within ten days from the date of entry of this order. If the Court determines that it does not have subject matter jurisdiction this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. The Plaintiff shall file its disclosure statement to comply with Rule 7.1(a)(1) within ten (10) days of this Order. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LLFlex, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued) (SRH)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Granges Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Proposed Order) (SRH)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN AID OF ARBITRATION, filed by Granges Americas, Inc., against LLFlex, LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3337352. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit 1- Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2- 4/21/21 letter, #4 Exhibit 3- 4/23/21 letter, #5 Exhibit 4- 4/29/21 letter, #6 Exhibit 5- UCC Financing Statement, #7 Exhibit 6- Illinois Financing Statement, #8 Exhibit 7- Aging Report, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Summons tendered, #11 Summons tendered) (SRH) Modified docket text on 5/6/2021 (SRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granges Americas, Inc. v. LLFlex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLFlex, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granges Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. McSherry
Represented By: Lindsey A. Roberts
Represented By: Matthew D. Gurbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?