White v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Disability Income Plan et al
Plaintiff: James White
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Disability Income Plan and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00303
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James White. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Disability Income Plan waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021; UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Berger, Erik)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ERIK W. BERGER signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/17/21; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erik W. Berger. cc: Counsel(DJT)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Erik W. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt L33066932 by Plaintiff James White (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (DJT)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Disability Income Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for serving the attached issued summons(es). Summons' sent back to counsel while awaiting the PHV ruling. (DJT)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Disability Income Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America Filing fee $ 402, receipt number L33066932., filed by James White. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Disability Income Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Disability Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Erik W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?