Kersting v. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Plaintiff: Norma Kersting
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees and American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Council 962
Case Number: 3:2021cv00358
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/21/2021 granting #14 Motion for Attorney Lauren E. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Norma Kersting. (Berger, Lauren)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/19/2021. On or before July 30, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the pro hac vice motion (DN #14 ) identifying the state in which attorney Berger resides. cc: counsel (JM)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Lauren E. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3377560. by Plaintiff Norma Kersting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lauren E. Berger, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Dutkanych, Andrew)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/2/2021. Upon request of counsel and by agreement of the parties, the 7/29/2021 telephonic scheduling conference is REMANDED from the docket and RESCHEDULED for 8/12/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (TLB)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Council 962. (Jannace, Peter)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton on 6/29/2021. The Court declines to enter the parties proposed agreed order (DN #10 ). Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) allows the Plaintiff to amend her complaint once as a matter of course. The Clerks Office has already taken action to update the parties in the case according to the Amended Complaint (DN #9 ). Finally, the Court acknowledges that the Defendant waives service of process and directs the Defendant to respond within the time prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(JM)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Council 962. (Jannace, Peter)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, filed by Norma Kersting. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Devan A. Dannelly on behalf of Norma Kersting (Dannelly, Devan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 6/14/2021. Telephonic rule 16 case management conference set for 7/29/2021 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744. cc: counsel (JM)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees. (Jannace, Peter)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees. (MNM)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-002720 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3354456). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kersting v. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Kersting
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Devan A. Dannelly
Represented By: Lauren E. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: Peter J. Jannace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Council 962
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: Peter J. Jannace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?