Whatever It Takes Transmission Parts, Inc. v. Caballero
Plaintiff: Whatever It Takes Transmission Parts, Inc.
Defendant: Alonso Caballero
Case Number: 3:2021cv00397
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/4/21; granting #5 Proposed Agreed Order: Defendant Alonso Caballero SHALL have up to and including 8/24/2021, within which to serve an answer or to otherwise respond to the Complaint. cc: Counsel(DJT)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Alonso Caballero. (Hershberg, Paul)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Whatever It Takes Transmission Parts, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Russell, K.)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alonso Caballero. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alonso Caballero Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3364167., filed by Whatever It Takes Transmission Parts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whatever It Takes Transmission Parts, Inc. v. Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonso Caballero
Represented By: Paul Joseph Hershberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whatever It Takes Transmission Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T. Schmidt
Represented By: K. Gail Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?