Cobble et al v. T-Mobile Sprint et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Cobble and Rufina Cobble
Defendant: Chase Bank and T-Mobile Sprint
Case Number: 3:2021cv00415
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 29 2nd NOTICE That the Instant Action is Already Withdrawn, and Reminders of Constitutional Law, by Daniel Cobble. (SMJ)
July 19, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to re #26 Notice (Other) filed by Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Notice of Continuation & Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Cobble v Bennett, April 6, 2021 Order) (McCall, Kristin)
July 7, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Chase Bank. (McCall, Kristin)
July 1, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Withdrawal, by Daniel Cobble and Rufina Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (SMJ)
June 25, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY re #21 Response, filed by Daniel Cobble. (SMJ)
June 25, 2021 Filing 24 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to District Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (KJA)
June 25, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00020. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1. The Cobbles motion for reconsideration R. #20 is DENIED; and 2. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky, Louisville Division. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 6/24/21. (MJY) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #18 the Court's June 8, 2021 Order filed by T-Mobile Sprint. (Kingsley, Meredith) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Clerk's Note: re #22 Order mailed to Cobble via US Mail. (MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 24, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #21 RESPONSE (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #18 Order, by Daniel Cobble, pro se. (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 TENDERED SUR-REPLY to #15 Reply, #7 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Response filed by Daniel Cobble, pro se. (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 9, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #19 TENDERED SUR-REPLY (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #9 , #10 MOTION to Return Case to State Court : within twenty-one (21) days, Defendant Sprint Solutions, Inc., shall advise the Court regarding its consent, or lack thereof, to transferring the action to the Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/7/2021.(CBD)cc: CORand Daniel Cobble by US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for the Court to Report to Congress the Unconstitutionality of All Removal Statues by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble, pro se.(JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Return Case to State Court by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble, #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel Cobble, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by T-Mobile Sprint filed by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Post marked 6/3/2021)(JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 7, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Chase Bank (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 7, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION to Compel Arbitration by T-Mobile Sprint, #9 MOTION to Return Case to State Court by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble, #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel Cobble (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Chase Bank filed by Chase Bank. (Meek, Dustin) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Order by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble, #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Daniel Cobble filed by Chase Bank. (McCall, Kristin) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Chase Bank filed by Daniel Cobble, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 18, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION to Compel Arbitration by T-Mobile Sprint (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Mobile Sprint identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile Sprint.. (Kingsley, Meredith) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by T-Mobile Sprint. (Kingsley, Meredith) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Clerk's Note: Defendant states that Plaintiffs incorrectly identify T-Mobile Sprint as the defendant in this action. Defendant states correct name is "Sprint Solutions, Inc." (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Return to State Court by Daniel Cobble, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Notice of Withdrawal, #2 Envelope)(CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Return Case to State Court by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Notice)(JJ) . [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION to Compel by T-Mobile Sprint filed by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble, pro se. (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Chase Bank Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Johnson Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Meek, Dustin) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016.(MJY)cc: CORand Daniel Cobble and Rufina Cobble by US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 3, 2021 MOTION REFERRED: MOTION to Compel by T-Mobile Sprint Motions referred to PSO. (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 3, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support. by T-Mobile Sprint. (MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 3, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #1 Notice of Removal. (MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 2, 2021 Conflict Check run. (MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
May 2, 2021 INCORRECTLY FILED ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re STATE COURT MOTION to Compel and Memorandum in Support by T-Mobile Sprint. (MJY) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (MJY). [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chase Bank identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co. and identifying The Vanguard Group, Inc., as an investment advisor which is not a publicly held corporation, has reported that registered investment companies, other pooled investment vehicles and institutional accounts that it or its subsidiaries sponsor, manage or advise have aggregate ownership under certain regulations of 10% or more of the stock of JPMorgan Chase & Co. (MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 21-CI 171. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4961392), filed by Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
April 30, 2021 AMENDED COMPLAINT against T-Mobile Sprint and adding Chase Bank, filed by Daniel Cobble, Rufina Cobble. (Note: See DE #1 for pdf image.)(MJY) [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]
April 30, 2021 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support by T-Mobile Sprint. (Note: Filed as part of the State Court Record - see DE #1 for pdf image.) (MJY) Modified text on 5/10/2021 (CBD). [Transferred from kyed on 6/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobble et al v. T-Mobile Sprint et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufina Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: Kristin E. McCall
Represented By: Dustin E. Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile Sprint
Represented By: Meredith J. Kingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?