Albert v. Ensite USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norris Albert
Defendant: Ensite USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00418
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Scott R. McLaughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3411632. by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hays, John)
August 26, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Don Fogel to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3411599. by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hays, John)
August 26, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Defer filed by Ensite USA, Inc.. (Hays, John)
August 25, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate by Norris Albert re #15 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mazzaferro, Frank)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/20/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/19/2021 granting #21 Motion for Marlene C. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #22 Motion for John T. Hays to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
August 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for John T. Hays to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3403542) by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of Texas Certificate, #2 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John)
August 16, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Marlene C. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3403515) by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of Texas Certificate, #2 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John)
August 12, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Defer filed by Norris Albert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mazzaferro, Frank)
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/11/2021 granting #13 Motion for Frank Joseph Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Defer by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1) - Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A (part 2) - Motion to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit A (part 3) - Motion to Consolidate, #4 Exhibit A (part 4) - Motion to Consolidate, #5 Exhibit A (part 5) - Motion to Consolidate) (Sheller, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3394898) by Plaintiff Norris Albert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Fitapelli, Joseph)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Frank Joseph Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3394894) by Plaintiff Norris Albert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Mazzaferro, Frank)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/2/2021 granting #10 Proposed Agreed Order. EnSite's deadline to file its response to the Complaint is 8/12/2021. cc: Counsel (DLW)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah B. Kembel on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Kembel, Hannah)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Sheller on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/20/2021 granting #7 Motion for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3383539) by Plaintiff Norris Albert (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Burch, Richard)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph A. Fitapelli re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/2/2021. (KJA)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Frank J. Mazzaferro re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/2/2021. (KJA)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard J. Burch re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/30/2021. (KJA)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ensite USA, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Ensite USA, Inc. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3370366, filed by Norris Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Tolling Agreement, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert v. Ensite USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensite USA, Inc.
Represented By: Don Fogel
Represented By: Hannah B. Kembel
Represented By: John T. Hays
Represented By: John O. Sheller
Represented By: Marlene C. Williams
Represented By: Scott R. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norris Albert
Represented By: Frank J. Mazzaferro
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?