Murphy v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Murphy
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation and The Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00438
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/27/2021. Based on #20 , counsel shall file a further joint status report no later than 9/24/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (AEH)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Beaton on 8/17/2021. The Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs and Defendant Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation's proposed agreed order (DN #16 ) granting Roundpoint's partial motion to dismiss (DN #6 ) with prejudice counts II, III, and IV of the complaint against Defendant Roundpoint Mortgage only. cc: Counsel (JM)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/13/2021. Based on #17 , counsel shall file a further joint status report no later than 8/26/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (AEH)
August 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE JOINT STATUS REPORT by Thomas M. Murphy (Nemes, Jason)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order Granting RoundPoint's Partial Motion to Dismiss by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Rouse, John)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/2/2021. Counsel shall file a joint status report no later than 8/13/2021. cc: Counsel (MNM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. (Kemper, W.)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 7/14/2021 granting #10 Motion for Attorney Joseph V. Ronderos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 7/14/2021 granting #9 Motion for Attorney Shaun K. Ramey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 7/14/2021. On the Court's motion, a Telephonic Status Conference is scheduled for 8/2/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. To participate in the conference, counsel shall use the following dial in information: 1-888-808-6929, Access Code 2887606. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (AEH)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Joseph V. Ronderos to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3380800. by Defendant Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rouse, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Shaun K. Ramey to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3380799. by Defendant Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rouse, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Freedom Mortgage Corporation for Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Rouse, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Rouse, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1- Mortgage, #3 Proposed Order) (Rouse, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consent and Joinder in Notice of Removal by The Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Response Consent and Joinder in Notice of Removal) (Kemper, W.)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (DJT)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-003280. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3375766, filed by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 -State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letter) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Murphy
Represented By: Jason M. Nemes
Represented By: Robert J. Nemes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos
Represented By: Shaun K. Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Represented By: James M. Burd
Represented By: W. Douglas Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?