Roark v. CT Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Andrew Roark
Defendant: CT Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00676
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CT Group, LLC. (Henson, Calesia)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John C. Collins re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice or admission to court. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/3/2021. (KJA)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant CT Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Granting More Definite Statement) (Henson, Calesia). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 11/15/2021 (SMJ).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court (SRH)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CT Group, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-005596. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3467042). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court record, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roark v. CT Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Roark
Represented By: John C. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT Group, LLC
Represented By: Calesia S. Henson
Represented By: Shannon Antle Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?