Nautilus Insurance Company v. Colvin et al
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: Nina Colvin, Outer Loop Child Care, Inc. and Ramiah Berri Douglas
Case Number: 3:2022cv00274
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Count V by Counter Claimant Nina Colvin, Defendant Nina Colvin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sexton, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #20 MOTION to Dismiss . ERROR: Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by counsel as an attachment to the #20 Motion to Dismiss. CORRECTION: Statement re-filed by Clerk as a Corporate Disclosure Statement. See #22 . (RLK)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/1/2022 granting #10 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Exhibits (1) and (2) from DN #9 , filed by the Defendant, Nina Colvin, are hereby sealed and shall be filed conventionally with the clerk of this court. cc: Counsel (SRH)
June 30, 2022 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Outer Loop Child Care, Inc. (Docketed by Clerk. Was filed by counsel as an attachment to #20 Motion to Dismiss.) (RLK)
June 30, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Outer Loop Child Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order Dismissing, #3 Addendum Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) (Walker, Charles)
June 28, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Rogers, Jeremy)
June 21, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana A. Rice on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company (Rice, Dana)
June 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam P. Joffe on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company (Joffe, Adam)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/10/2022, GRANTING #13 Motion for Dana A. Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice OF DANA A. RICE Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3598486. by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Rogers, Jeremy)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/9/2022, GRANTING #11 Motion for Adam P. Joffe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
June 8, 2022 Filing 16 Receipt of Non-Electronic Document re DN #10 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, Exhibit 1. (SRH)
June 8, 2022 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT re #10 Motion for Leave to Seal Document, Exhibit 2. (SRH)
June 8, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Adam Joffe to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3597505. by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affdavit of Adam Joffee, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Rogers, Jeremy)
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document #9 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Counter Claimant Nina Colvin, Defendant Nina Colvin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sexton, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Nina Colvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Surveillance Video, #2 Exhibit Child Psychological Evaluation, #3 Exhibit Application for Employment, #4 Exhibit Court Net, #5 Exhibit Court Net) (Sexton, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nina Colvin, Ramiah Berri Douglas, Outer Loop Child Care, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Colvin and WMC, #2 Summons as to Outer Loop Child Care) (DJT)
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING TENDERED SUMMONS by Nautilus Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Outer Loop Child Care Summons, #2 Summons Colvin Summons, #3 Summons Douglas Summons) (Rogers, Jeremy)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Dana A. Rice re #1 Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No admission or pro hac vice motion pending. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/14/2022. (MLG)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Adam P. Joffe re #1 Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No admission or pro hac vice motion pending. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/14/2022. (MLG)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE on Summons re DN #1 Complaint to filing attorney, Jill F. Endicott. (CDL)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Admiral Insurance Company, Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation, and Corporate Parent Berkley Insurance Company for Nautilus Insurance Company by Nautilus Insurance Company. (CDL)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Sr. Judge Charles R. Simpson, III. (CDL)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Nina Colvin, Ramiah Berri Douglas, and Outer Loop Child Care, Inc. filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3587041. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colvin Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Nautilus Policy, #3 Exhibit C- Reservation of Rights Letter to Outer Loop, #4 Exhibit D - Reservation of Rights Letter to Douglas, #5 Cover Sheet. (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. Colvin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam P. Joffe
Represented By: Dana A. Rice
Represented By: Jeremy S. Rogers
Represented By: Jill F. Endicott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Colvin
Represented By: John W. Byrnes
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outer Loop Child Care, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramiah Berri Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?