Dunbar v. Evolent Health Plan
Plaintiff: Toyia Dunbar
Defendant: Evolent Health Plan
Case Number: 3:2022cv00304
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 fm Notice of Removal - Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/3/2022. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 8/15/2022. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 11/4/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/8/2023. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 12/15/2022. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 1/16/2023. Expert Discovery due by 6/8/2023. Joint Report re settlement due by 12/15/2022. Joint status report re parties' positions on mediation due by 6/8/2023. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 7/20/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2024 at 1:30 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (*See order for pretrial filing deadlines); Jury Trial set for 2/26/2024 at 9:30 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. cc: counsel, CHL (CM), Jury Admin. (JM)
August 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: incorrect document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #17 Response to Motion ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Hayward, Samuel)
August 1, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Toyia Dunbar. (Hayward, Samuel) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/2/2022) (SMJ).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/20/2022 granting #14 Proposed Agreed Order. Plaintiff shall have until ten (10) days after the Court enters this order to respond to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
July 13, 2022 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Evolent Health Plan. (Phillips, Michael)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order for extension of time to respond by Plaintiff Toyia Dunbar (Hayward, Samuel) Modified on 7/5/2022, event corrected (SMJ).
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/30/2022 granting #10 Motion for Melissa Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/30/2022 granting #11 Motion for Michael Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Michael R. Philips to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3606523. by Defendant Evolent Health Plan (Wyrick, Mitzi)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Melissa M. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3606509. by Defendant Evolent Health Plan (Wyrick, Mitzi)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/22/2022 granting #8 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants shall have until twenty-one (21) days after the Court enters an order on Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order by Evolent Health Plan. (Wyrick, Mitzi)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Evolent Health Plan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wyrick, Mitzi)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/10/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/8/2022; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-CHL. (ARM)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re: DN #1 Notice of Removal. (CDL)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (CDL)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evolent Health Plan. (CDL)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Evolent Health Plan from Jefferson Circuit Court (No Answer Filed), case number 22-CI-001851 (Filing fee $402; Receipt No. AKYWDC-3596621), filed by Evolent Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Filings, #3 Cover Sheet) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunbar v. Evolent Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toyia Dunbar
Represented By: Samuel G. Hayward
Represented By: Shelby L. Campbell
Represented By: Samuel G. Hayward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolent Health Plan
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Represented By: Melissa Marie Weiss
Represented By: Michael R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?