Domine et al v. Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Domine and Louisville Historic Tours LLC
Defendant: Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Louisville, Ghost City Studios LLC and Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00446
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Ghost City Studios LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Nealon, #2 Proposed Order) (Walker, Andrew)
October 28, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, by Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC. (Walker, Andrew)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/11/2022 granting #15 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC a/k/a Ghost City Tours of Louisville, Ghost City Studios LLC, and Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC shall have until 10/28/2022, to respond to the amended complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
October 7, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order by Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC. (Moad, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/6/2022 granting #11 Motion for attorney John R. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/6/2022 granting #12 Motion for Attorney Andrew J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
October 3, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Andrew J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Filing fee $125, receipt # 300000973 - by Defendants Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cert. of Good Standing) (SMJ)
October 3, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for John R. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Filing fee $125, receipt # 300000974 - by Defendants Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cert. of Good Standing) (SMJ)
September 30, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Domine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Awards and Recognitions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Domine Books, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copyright Registrations, #4 Exhibit 4 - Public Appearances) (McGraw, Brian)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/22/2022 granting #8 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC a/k/a Ghost City Tours of Louisville, Ghost City Studios LLC, and Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC shall have until 10/13/2022, to respond to the complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 21, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order by Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC. (Moad, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC. (Moad, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Domine, Louisville Historic Tours LLC. Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC served on 9/1/2022, answer due 9/22/2022. (McGraw, Brian) Modified on 9/8/2022 - text added (SMJ).
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE U.S. Copyright re #1 Complaint. (DeW)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC, Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DeW)
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louisville Historic Tours LLC. (DeW)
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DeW)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (JURY TRIAL DEMANDED) filed by David Domine, Louisville Historic Tours LLC, against Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC, Ghost City Studios LLC, Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3648321.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Awards and Recognitions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Domine Books, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copyright Registrations, #4 Exhibit 4 - Public Appearances, #5 Summons TENDERED Ghost City Tours, #6 Summons TENDERED Ghost City Studios, #7 Summons TENDERED Ghost City Holdings, #8 Cover Sheet) (DeW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domine et al v. Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moad
Represented By: John R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghost City Tours of Louisville
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moad
Represented By: John R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghost City Studios LLC
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moad
Represented By: John R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghost City Tours Holding, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moad
Represented By: John R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Domine
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Represented By: Brian P. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville Historic Tours LLC
Represented By: Augustus S. Herbert
Represented By: Brian P. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?