Uribe v. Ramser et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Castro Uribe
Defendant: Cinthia Ranser, Tom Ramser, Cynthia Ramser and EER Investments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00637
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/27/23; re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EER Investments, LLC, Cynthia Ramser, Tom Ramser, Schedules re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss : Plaintiff may file her response to the Motion to Dismiss, [R. #10 ], on or before Monday, 2/6/2023. Plaintiff is WARNED that the failure to respond will be construed as a lack of objection to the motion and may result in dismissal of this action. Should Plaintiff file a response to the motion, Defendants may file their reply within fourteen (14) days of its filing. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 1/25/23; granting #13 Motion to Withdraw #13 MOTION to Withdraw #11 Notice of Deficiency Withdrawal of Attorney as Counsel of Record : TheClerk is directed to terminate attorney Max Scweiger as counsel of record in this case. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by EER Investments, LLC. (Lammi, William)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2023. (DJT)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/20/23; granting #14 Motion to Amend/Correct: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to revise the name of Defendant Cinthia Ranser to Cynthia Ramser in the caption of this case to reflect the correct spelling of her name. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(pro se)(DJT)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/20/2023. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except for pretrial conference and trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Resubmitted) by EER Investments, LLC, Tom Ramser, Cynthia Ramser. (Lammi, William)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/6/2; re #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Order,, Add and Terminate Parties, Correct Misnomer filed by Cinthia Ranser, EER Investments, LLC, Tom Ramser, Schedules re: #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Order, Correct Misnomer : Plaintiff may file her response to the Motion to Correct Misnomer, [R. 14], on or before Friday, 1/13/2023. The Court will construe a failure to respond as a lack of any objection to the motion. Should Plaintiff object to the motion, Defendants may file a reply on or before Monday, 1/16/2023. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Correct Misnomer per #12 Order by Defendants EER Investments, LLC, Tom Ramser, and Cinthia Ranser (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lammi, William) Modified on 1/6/2023: updated docket text to accurately reflect filing (RLK).
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw #11 Notice of Deficiency Withdrawal of Attorney as Counsel of Record by Defendants EER Investments, LLC, Tom Ramser, Cinthia Ranser (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lammi, William)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/30/22: The Clerk of Court shall remove Cynthia Ramser as a named defendant in the Court's record. On or before Friday, 1/6/2023, Defendants may file a motion to correct the misspelling of Cinthia Ranser. cc:counsel (DJT)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Max Schweiger re #9 Answer to Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No admission or motion to appear pro hac vice filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/17/2023. (MLG)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants EER Investments, LLC, Cynthia Ramser, Tom Ramser (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lammi, William)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tom Ramser, Cynthia Ramser, EER Investments, LLC. (Lammi, William)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/16/22 ; denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Grant Time to Place All Videos On C.D. Form for the Court, [R. #7 ], is DENIED without prejudice. cc: Counsel(DJT)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Grant Time to Place All Videos on CD Form for the Court by Plaintiff Ruth Castro Uribe. (Attachments: #1 Medical Record) (MNM)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ruth Castro Uribe. (MNM)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/8/22; denying #2 Motion Service of Summons. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(pro se) (DJT)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tom Ramser, Cinthia Ranser. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDL) Modified on 12/5/2022 (CDL).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (CDL)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION Service of Summons by U.S. Marshall's office re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ruth Castro Uribe. (CDL)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tom Ramser and Cinthia Ranser, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 300001686), filed by Ruth Castro Uribe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Complaint, (CDL) Modified on 12/5/2022 (CDL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uribe v. Ramser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Castro Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinthia Ranser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ramser
Represented By: Maximillian Schweiger
Represented By: William B. Lammi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Ramser
Represented By: Maximillian Schweiger
Represented By: William B. Lammi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EER Investments, LLC
Represented By: William B. Lammi
Represented By: Maximillian Schweiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?