Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC v. Luctor International, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC doing business as Coral Cay Beverage Group
Defendant: Luctor International, L.L.C. doing business as 375 Park Avenue Spirits, Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc. doing business as 375 Park Avenue Spirits and Sazerac Distillers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00223
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/28/2023 granting #16 Proposed Agreed Order. The deadline for Defendants' responsive pleadings is held in abeyance pending the outcome of mediation. If mediation is unsuccessful, the parties shall confer to set a new deadline for Defendants' responsive pleadings that is not less than 21 days after the date of mediation. cc: Counsel (SRH)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Proposed Agreed Order hold Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline in Abeyance by Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc., Luctor International, L.L.C., Sazerac Distillers, LLC. (Guillory, Anne)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Sazerac Distillers, LLC. (Guillory, Anne)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc.. (Guillory, Anne)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Luctor International, L.L.C.. (Guillory, Anne)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency to Attorney Anne Katherine Guillory, counsel for the Defendants, for failure to file Rule 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement in any action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity (effective 12/1/2022). Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2023. (RLK)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Sazerac Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Sazerac Brands, LLC for Sazerac Distillers, LLC. by Sazerac Distillers, LLC. (Guillory, Anne)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Sazerac Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Sazerac Brands, LLC, Corporate Parent Sazerac Distillers, LLC for Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc.. by Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc.. (Guillory, Anne)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Luctor International, L.L.C.. (Guillory, Anne)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sazerac Distillers, LLC. Sazerac Distillers, LLC waiver sent on 5/3/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (Guillory, Anne)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc.. Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (Guillory, Anne)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luctor International, L.L.C.. Luctor International, L.L.C. waiver sent on 5/3/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (Guillory, Anne)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC. (Deatrick, David)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint to David R. Deatrick, Jr., attorney for plaintiff. Reason for Deficiency: Missing 7.1 (a)(2) Disclosure Statement for Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/10/2023. (CDL)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (CDL)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC. (CDL)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc., Luctor International, L.L.C., Sazerac Distillers, LLC, (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3799938), filed by Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered and Notice of Intent to Request Waiver of Service) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC v. Luctor International, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Spirits Distilling, LLC doing business as Coral Cay Beverage Group
Represented By: Ashley Faye Cheahtam Stevens
Represented By: David Ross Deatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luctor International, L.L.C. doing business as 375 Park Avenue Spirits
Represented By: Anne Katherine Guillory
Represented By: Philip E. Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Trace Distillery, Inc. doing business as 375 Park Avenue Spirits
Represented By: Anne Katherine Guillory
Represented By: Philip E. Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sazerac Distillers, LLC
Represented By: Anne Katherine Guillory
Represented By: Philip E. Cecil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?