LaPlace v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Natalie LaPlace
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi S.A. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00581
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
2 Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Filing 29 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Frederick B. Darley, III re 18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/15/2023. (KJA)
November 29, 2023 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: Sanofi has filed a Notice of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings (DN #27 ), informing the Court that the parties are finalizing a Master Settlement Agreement and asking the Court to stay this matter through May 24, 2024. The Court grants the request for a stay in partvacating all deadlines EXCEPT the status conference scheduled for January 9, 2024, which will proceed as planned. The Court further orders the parties to file a joint status report by January 8, 2024 updating the Court on the anticipated resolution and any next steps the parties anticipate in the litigation. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Startsman, Emily)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 11/21/2023 granting #22 Motion for Attorney Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 11/21/2023 granting #20 Motion for Attorney Alexa B. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 11/21/2023 granting #19 Motion for Anthony D. Birchfield, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (HMC)
November 20, 2023 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: In light of this case's transfer from the Eastern District of Louisiana, the Court orders the parties to file a joint status report within 21 days describing the cases procedural posture, any outstanding deadlines, the principal disputed issues, and any past or anticipated efforts to resolve this matter outside of court. The report should also address when this case could be ready to try and the steps preliminary to trial. The Court further schedules a remote status conference to discuss the joint status report on 1/9/24 at 2:00 p.m. ET. The parties may join the Zoom hearing by audio only (cameras turned off) at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603277726?pwd=Z3R3S05sbSsxdkFITDgxT0tldEc2dz09. The meeting ID is 160 327 7726 and the passcode is 612433. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
November 16, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3923792. by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (DePaz, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (HMC).
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton for all further proceedings. Judge David J. Hale no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel (DLW)
November 14, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Alexa B. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number AKYWDC-3921820) by Plaintiff Natalie LaPlace (Hall, Jonaka) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (HMC).
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Anthony D. Birchfield, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number AKYWDC-3921804) by Plaintiff Natalie LaPlace (Hall, Jonaka) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2023: #2 Proposed Order) (HMC).
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 11/13/2023 granting #14 Motion for Frederick B. Darley, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
November 13, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Startsman, Emily)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Startsman on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Startsman, Emily)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/13/2023; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
November 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Frederick B. Darley, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number AKYWDC-3919698) by Plaintiff Natalie LaPlace (Hall, Jonaka) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (DLW).
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonaka White Hall on behalf of Natalie LaPlace (Hall, Jonaka)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Matthew Edward DePaz re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/22/2023. (KJA)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Andy D. Birchfield, Jr. re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/22/2023. (KJA)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Frederick B. Darley, III re #8 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/22/2023. (KJA)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to District Judge David J. Hale. (KJA)
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-09848. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA) Modified on 11/8/2023 to edit file date (KJA).
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from laed on 11/8/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from laed on 11/8/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/8/2023.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/8/2023.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from laed on 11/8/2023.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 11/8/2023.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6387432) filed by Natalie LaPlace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney Frederick B. Darley, III added to party Natalie LaPlace(pty:pla).(Darley, Frederick) [Transferred from laed on 11/8/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaPlace v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie LaPlace
Represented By: Frederick B. Darley, III
Represented By: Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.
Represented By: Alexa B. Wallace
Represented By: Jonaka White Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?