Stevenson v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Stevenson
Defendant: Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC separately, and doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00595
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Judge Beaton held a combined hearing via Zoom on January 9, 2024 in case nos. 3:23-cv-571, 3:23-cv-572, 3:23-cv-573, 3:23-cv-581, 3:23-cv-583, 3:23-cv-595, 3:23-cv-597, 3:23-cv-604, and 3:23-cv-610. Plaintiffs counsel in cases -571 and -573 did not appear. Case nos. -571, -573, -581, -583, -604, and -610 remain stayed while the parties finalize a Master Settlement Agreement, and the Court orders counsel in those cases to file status reports no later than April 19, 2024. Case nos. -572, -595, and -597 are not stayed, but the Court likewise orders counsel in those cases to file status reports regarding the next steps in the litigation no later than April 19, 2024. (Court Reporter: Terri Horton)(TIC: 0/25 minutes) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
December 12, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing and Permission to Sign Joint Status Report on Behalf of John Hunter Bryson by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #26 Status Report (DePaz, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (DePaz, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/4/2023 granting #20 Motion for attorney Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/4/2023 granting #23 Motion for Attorney John Hunter Bryson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
November 30, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for John Hunter Bryson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3930935. by Plaintiff Tracy Stevenson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whitfield, John)
November 30, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. Bryson on behalf of Tracy Stevenson (Bryson, Daniel)
November 29, 2023 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3929044. by Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (DePaz, Matthew) Modified attachment description on 11/29/2023 (HMC).
November 28, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Startsman, Emily)
November 28, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Startsman on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Startsman, Emily)
November 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. Bryson on behalf of Tracy Stevenson (Bryson, Daniel)
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: In light of this case's transfer from the Eastern District of Louisiana, the Court orders the parties to file a joint status report within 21 days describing the cases procedural posture, any outstanding deadlines, the principal disputed issues, and any past or anticipated efforts to resolve this matter outside of court. The report should also address when this case could be ready to try and the steps preliminary to trial. The Court further schedules a remote status conference to discuss the joint status report on 1/9/24 at 2:00 p.m. ET. The parties may join the Zoom hearing by audio only (cameras turned off) at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603277726?pwd=Z3R3S05sbSsxdkFITDgxT0tldEc2dz09. The meeting ID is 160 327 7726 and the passcode is 612433. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Whitfield on behalf of Tracy Stevenson (Whitfield, John)
November 16, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John Hunter Bryson re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/30/2023. (KJA)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Matthew Edward DePaz re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/30/2023. (KJA)
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to District Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KJA)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01282. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA) Modified on 11/16/2023 to edit file date (KJA).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Kentucky Western. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by Tracy Stevenson re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC d-b-a Winthrop)(Bryson, Daniel) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 5 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT by Tracy Stevenson per Rec Doc 782 in Master Case. (cbs) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(tm) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5967253) filed by Tracy Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Aventis Pharma S.A., #3 Summons for Sanofi S.A., #4 Summons for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC) Attorney Daniel K. Bryson added to party Tracy Stevenson(pty:pla).(Bryson, Daniel) Modified on 2/14/2017 (tm). [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Stevenson
Represented By: John Hunter Bryson
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: John C Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC separately, and doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?