Shadowen v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Shadowen
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00597
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Judge Beaton held a combined hearing via Zoom on January 9, 2024 in case nos. 3:23-cv-571, 3:23-cv-572, 3:23-cv-573, 3:23-cv-581, 3:23-cv-583, 3:23-cv-595, 3:23-cv-597, 3:23-cv-604, and 3:23-cv-610. Plaintiffs counsel in cases -571 and -573 did not appear. Case nos. -571, -573, -581, -583, -604, and -610 remain stayed while the parties finalize a Master Settlement Agreement, and the Court orders counsel in those cases to file status reports no later than April 19, 2024. Case nos. -572, -595, and -597 are not stayed, but the Court likewise orders counsel in those cases to file status reports regarding the next steps in the litigation no later than April 19, 2024. (Court Reporter: Terri Horton)(TIC: 0/25 minutes) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 1/3/2024 granting #22 Motion for Aaron C. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (DeW)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing and Permission to Sign Joint Status Report on Behalf of Aaron C. Johnson and Alex C. Davis by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC re #24 Status Report (DePaz, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (DePaz, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/4/2023 granting #19 Motion for Attorney Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 1, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Aaron C Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3931939. by Plaintiff Donna Shadowen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COGS Kansas, #2 Exhibit COGS Missouri) (Davis, Alex) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2023: #3 Proposed Order) (KDY).
December 1, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex C. Davis on behalf of Donna Shadowen (Davis, Alex)
November 29, 2023 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Matthew E. DePaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3929042. by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (DePaz, Matthew) Modified attachment description on 11/29/2023 (HMC).
November 28, 2023 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Startsman, Emily)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Startsman on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Startsman, Emily)
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: In light of this case's transfer from the Eastern District of Louisiana, the Court orders the parties to file a joint status report within 21 days describing the cases procedural posture, any outstanding deadlines, the principal disputed issues, and any past or anticipated efforts to resolve this matter outside of court. The report should also address when this case could be ready to try and the steps preliminary to trial. The Court further schedules a remote status conference to discuss the joint status report on 1/9/24 at 2:00 p.m. ET. The parties may join the Zoom hearing by audio only (cameras turned off) at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603277726?pwd=Z3R3S05sbSsxdkFITDgxT0tldEc2dz09. The meeting ID is 160 327 7726 and the passcode is 612433. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
November 16, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David G. Summers re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/30/2023. (KJA)
November 16, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Aaron Clark Johnson re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/30/2023. (KJA)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Matthew Edward DePaz re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/30/2023. (KJA)
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to District Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KJA)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-07341. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA) Modified on 11/16/2023 to edit file date (KJA).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Western District of Kentucky. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (tk) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (tk) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Johnson, Aaron) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, "Incorrect format of Summons. Filing attorney incorrectly listed multiple defendants on one. Summons form should only be addressed to one named defendant (per form) with its proper name. Clerk is unable to issue incorrectly formatted summons. Attorney must refile in the member case a properly completed summons for each named defendant in which he seeks service." (tk) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, "Document's signature line is either incomplete or blank. All future documents must reflect either an original signature or an electronic signature of the filing attorney following the format 's/ (attorney name)'. No further action is required at this time." (tk) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7040230) filed by Donna Shadowen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Aaron Clark Johnson added to party Donna Shadowen(pty:pla).(Johnson, Aaron) [Transferred from laed on 11/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shadowen v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Carol D. Browning
Represented By: Emily L. Startsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Shadowen
Represented By: Aaron Clark Johnson
Represented By: David G Summers
Represented By: Aaron C. Johnson
Represented By: Alex C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?